EP0775288 - GAS CARTRIDGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CONSTANTIA (INTERNATIONAL) LIMITED Suite E, Regal House, Queensway Gibraltar / GI | [1997/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saxby, Michael Ernest P.O. Box 25 Bexhill-on-Sea, East Sussex TN39 4BQ / GB | [1997/22] | Representative(s) | Picker, Madeline Margaret, et al Brookes Batchellor 1 Boyne Park Tunbridge Wells Kent TN4 8EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/22] | Picker, Madeline Margaret, et al Brookes & Martin, High Holborn House, 52/54 High Holborn London WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 94923783.8 | 15.08.1994 | [1997/22] | WO1994GB01779 | Priority number, date | GB19930017040 | 16.08.1993 Original published format: GB 9317040 | [1997/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9505573 | Date: | 23.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0775288 | Date: | 28.05.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0775288 | Date: | 20.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F42B6/10, F41B11/06, F41B11/32 | [1997/22] | CPC: |
F42B8/02 (EP,US);
F41B11/62 (EP,US);
F41B11/721 (EP,US);
F42B6/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/22] | Title | German: | GASKARTOUSCHE | [1997/22] | English: | GAS CARTRIDGE | [1997/22] | French: | CARTOUCHE DE GAZ | [1997/22] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.1996 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.02.1996 | Examination requested [1997/22] | 18.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 01.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 00/exclusive | For: | all designated states | Licencee: | Holland Entrepreneurial Resourcing B.V. 's Gravelandsweg 25A 12111 BN Hilversum / NL | Date: | 29.03.1999 | ID: | 01 01/exclusive | For: | all designated states | Licencee: | Crown Aircartridge Ltd. c/o McPherson & Partners 23 St.Leonards Road, Bexhill-on-Sea East Sussex TN40 1HH / GB | Date: | 29.03.1999 |
Former [1999/36] | ID: | 01 00/exclusive | |
For: | all designated states | ||
Licencee: | Holland Entrepreneurial Resourcing B.V. 's Gravelandsweg 25A 12111 BN Hilversum / NL | ||
Date: | 29.03.1999 | ||
ID: | 01 01/exclusive | ||
For: | all designated states | ||
Licencee: | Crown Aircartridge Ltd. c/o McPherson & Partners 23 St.Leonards Road, Bexhill-on-Sea East Sussex TN40 1HH / GB | ||
Date: | 29.03.1999 | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 20.10.1999 | DK | 20.01.2000 | PT | 20.01.2000 | [2003/45] |
Former [2002/23] | SE | 20.10.1999 | |
PT | 20.01.2000 | ||
Former [2000/43] | PT | 20.01.2000 | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2369537 (HILVENNA LTD [GB]) [X] 1 * page 5, line 31 - page 6, line 5 * * page 8, line 14 - line 25; figures 1,3 *; | [XA]FR2403536 (HILVENNA LTD [GB]) [X] 1 * page 12, line 27 - page 3, line 35; figures 3-7 * [A] 3,5,6; | [A]US4531458 (SAXBY MICHAEL E [GB]) [A] 1,2,4 * column A; figure - *; | [XA]GB2153983 (HILVENNA LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * * page 4, line 27 - line 80; figure 1 * [A] 5; | [A]EP0189974 (HILVENNA LTD [GB]) [A] 4* abstract *; | [DA]EP0499332 (SAXBY MICHAEL ERNEST [NL]) [DA] 1,2,4 * abstract * | by applicant | FR2403536 | EP0499332 |