EP0713532 - MODIFIED MAXADILAN PROTEIN, ITS PREPARATION AND USE, AND DNA ENCODING THE PROTEIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.01.2001 [2001/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHISEIDO COMPANY LIMITED 7-5-5, Ginza, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8010 / JP | For all designated states THE GENERAL HOSPITAL CORPORATION 55 Fruit Street Boston, MA 02114 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/05] | For all designated states SHISEIDO COMPANY LIMITED 7-5-5, Ginza Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-10 / JP | ||
For all designated states THE GENERAL HOSPITAL CORPORATION 55 Fruit Street Boston, MA 02110 / US | |||
Former [1996/22] | For all designated states SHISEIDO COMPANY LIMITED 7-5-5, Ginza Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-10 / JP | ||
For all designated states THE GENERAL HOSPITAL CORPORATION 55 Fruit Street Boston, MA 02114 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAJIMA, Masahiro 514-1, Shinanocho Totsuka Yokohama 244 / JP | 02 /
OHNUMA, Manami 7-22-9, Imaizumidai Kamakura Kanagawa 247 / JP | 03 /
LERNER, Ethan, L. 20 Rawson Road Brookline, MA 02146 / US | [1996/22] | Representative(s) | Warcoin, Jacques, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/22] | Warcoin, Jacques, et al Cabinet Régimbeau, 26, avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 94924128.5 | 05.08.1994 | [1996/22] | WO1994US08809 | Priority number, date | US19930102757 | 06.08.1993 Original published format: US 102757 | [1996/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9504829 | Date: | 16.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0713532 | Date: | 29.05.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0713532 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/62, C07K14/435, C12N15/12, A61K38/17 | [1996/22] | CPC: |
C07K14/43577 (EP,US);
A61P9/08 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/22] | Title | German: | MODIFIZIERTE MAXADILAN-PROTEIN, DESSEN HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG, UND DEM PROTEIN KODIERENDE DNS | [1999/14] | English: | MODIFIED MAXADILAN PROTEIN, ITS PREPARATION AND USE, AND DNA ENCODING THE PROTEIN | [1996/22] | French: | PROTEINE MAXADILANE MODIFIEE,SA PRODUCTION ET UTILISATION,ET ADN CODANT POUR CETTE PROTEINE | [1999/14] |
Former [1996/22] | MODIFIZIERTE MOXADILAN-PROTEIN, DESSEN HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG, UND DEM PROTEIN KODIERENDE DNS | ||
Former [1996/22] | PROTREINE MAXADILANE MODIFIEE | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.1996 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/22] | 13.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0293249 (AMRAD CORP LTD [AU]) [A] 12-16 * page 9, column L *; | [AD]WO9100293 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US]) [AD] 1-26 * the whole document * | [AD] - E.A.LERNER & C.B.SHOEMAKER, "Maxadilan. Cloning and funnctional expresssion of the gene encoding this potent vasodilator peptide", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY., BALTIMORE US, (19920115), vol. 267, no. 2, pages 1062 - 1066 [AD] 1-26,30-32 * the whole document * |