EP0710135 - Extracorporeal Affinity Adsorption Devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/19] | EXTRACORPOREAL AFFINITY ADSORPTION DEVICES | ||
[2007/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.11.2009 [2009/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Strahilevitz, Meir P.O.Box 25008 Seattle, WA 98125-1908 / US | [2008/14] |
Former [1996/19] | For all designated states Strahilevitz, Meir P.O.Box 190 Hansville, WA 98340 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1996/19] | Representative(s) | Machtalère, Georges, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. 55, rue des Bruyères 1274 Howald / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2008/45] | Machtalère, Georges, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. 55, rue des Bruyères 1274 Howald / LU | ||
Former [1996/19] | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 L-1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 94924465.1 | 20.07.1994 | [1996/19] | WO1994US08043 | Priority number, date | US19930097378 | 23.07.1993 Original published format: US 97378 | [1996/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9503084 | Date: | 02.02.1995 | [1995/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0710135 | Date: | 08.05.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0710135 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.03.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/36 | [2007/31] | CPC: |
A61M1/3679 (EP,US);
A61M1/3475 (EP,US);
A61M1/3486 (EP,US);
A61M1/362 (EP,US);
A61P37/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1996/19] | A61M37/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1996/19] | Title | German: | Extrakorporeale Vorrichtungen zur Adsorption durch Affinität | [2007/31] | English: | Extracorporeal Affinity Adsorption Devices | [2007/31] | French: | Dispositifs de traitement extracorporel basés sur l'adsorption par affinité | [2007/31] |
Former [1996/19] | EXTRAKORPOREALE VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR ADSORPTION DURCH AFFINITÄT | ||
Former [1996/19] | EXTRACORPOREAL AFFINITY ADSORPTION DEVICES | ||
Former [1996/19] | DISPOSITIFS DE TRAITMENT EXTRACORPOREL BASES SUR L'ADSORPTION PAR AFFINITE | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.1996 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.1996 | Search fee paid | 27.01.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed | 29.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/19] | 01.04.1999 | Observations by third parties | 26.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2004 | 11   M06   Fee paid on   19.01.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8909628 (POTEMPA LAWRENCE A [US], et al) [A] 1-38 * column A * * page 1, line 1 - page 9, paragraph 2 * * page 12, paragraph 1 - page 14, paragraph 1 * * page 22, line 12 - page 24, line 8 * * page 25, paragraph 3 - page 27, paragraph 8; claims 1,9-14 *; | [A]WO9004416 (INVITRON CORP [US]) [A] 1-38 * abstract * * page 3, line 34 - page 5, line 35 * * page 6, line 33 - page 9, line 5 * * page 10, line 28 - page 11, line 18; figure 2 *; | [A]US5187010 (PARHAM MARC E [US], et al) [A] 1-38 * column A ** column 2, line 30 - line 68; figures 1,2; example 1; claims 1-4 * | International search | [A]US4375414 (STRAHILEVITZ MEIR [US]); | [A]US4612122 (AMBRUS CLARA [US], et al); | [A]US4770784 (DAVIS JAMES C [US], et al); | [A]US4813924 (STRAHILEVITZ MEIR [US]); | [A]US5211850 (SHETTIGAR UDIPI [US], et al) | other | US4612122 | EP0269279 | WO8904675 | - I.M.NILSSON ET AL, "A Procedure for Removing High Titer Antibodies by Extracorporeal Protei-A-Sepharose Adsorption in Hemophilia: Sustitution Therapy and Surgery in a Patient with Hemophilia B and Antibodies", BLOOD, (198107), vol. 58, no. 1, pages 38 - 44, XP000667390 |