EP0670775 - ELECTROLUMINESCENT DEVICES AND PROCESSES USING POLYTHIOPHENES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.2000 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POLAROID CORPORATION 549 Technology Square Cambridge Massachusetts 02139-3589 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/37] | For all designated states POLAROID CORPORATION 549 Technology Square Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139-3589 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEHTA, Parag, G. 7 Nathan's Way Peabody, MA 01960 / US | [1995/37] | Representative(s) | Splanemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Rumfordstrasse 7 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/37] | Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Splanemann Dr. B. Reitzner Dipl.-Ing. K. Baronetzky Tal 13 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94924549.2 | 02.08.1994 | [1995/37] | WO1994US08724 | Priority number, date | US19930111657 | 25.08.1993 Original published format: US 111657 | [1995/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9505937 | Date: | 02.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0670775 | Date: | 13.09.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0670775 | Date: | 23.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.03.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B32B3/00, B32B27/14, H05B33/14, C09K11/06 | [1995/46] | CPC: |
H05B33/14 (EP,US);
C09K11/06 (EP,US);
Y10S428/917 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24802 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/37] | B32B3/00, B32B27/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/37] | Title | German: | ELEKTROLUMINESZENTE VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON POLYTHIOPHENEN | [1995/37] | English: | ELECTROLUMINESCENT DEVICES AND PROCESSES USING POLYTHIOPHENES | [1995/37] | French: | DISPOSITIFS ELECTROLUMINESCENTS ET PROCEDES UTILISANT DES POLYTHIOPHENES | [1995/37] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.1995 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.1995 | Search fee paid | 08.04.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/37] | 24.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.11.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 23.02.2000 | [2008/05] | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US5104749 (SATO YOSHIHARU [JP], et al); | [Y]US4775820 (EGUCHI KEN [JP], et al) | Examination | - OHMORI Y. ET AL, "visisible-light electroluminescent diodes uitlizing poly(3-alkylthiophenes)", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, (19911101), vol. 30, no. 11B, pages L1938 - L1940 | - MCCULLOUGH R.D. AND LOWE R.D., "the synthesis of well-defined conducting poly(3-alkylthiophenes)", POLYMER PREPRINTS, (19920401), vol. 33, no. 1, pages 195 - 196 |