EP0668842 - DRIVE MECHANISM FOR A BOBBIN HEAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.11.1999 [1999/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Barmag-Spinnzwirn GmbH Zwickauer Strasse 247 D-09116 Chemnitz / DE | [1998/49] |
Former [1995/35] | For all designated states Barmag Spinnzwirn GmbH Zwickauer Strasse 247 D-09116 Chemnitz / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEHNERT, Siegfried Dorfstrasse 8 D-09405 Gornau / DE | 02 /
GRÖTZSCHEL, Jochen Schillerstrasse 33 D-09128 Kleinolbersdorf-Altenh. / DE | 03 /
KROLL, Peter Fritz-Fritzsche-Strasse 83 D-09123 Chemnitz / DE | [1995/35] | Representative(s) | Pfingsten, Dieter Krienen Pfingsten Trusowski Königstrasse 49 42853 Remscheid / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/35] | Pfingsten, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. Barmag AG, Leverkuser Strasse 65 D-42897 Remscheid / DE | Application number, filing date | 94924704.3 | 01.09.1994 | [1995/35] | WO1994DE01002 | Priority number, date | DE19934330631 | 10.09.1993 Original published format: DE 4330631 | [1995/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9507228 | Date: | 16.03.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0668842 | Date: | 30.08.1995 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0668842 | Date: | 02.12.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B65H54/74, B65H54/42 | [1995/35] | CPC: |
B65H54/42 (EP);
B65H54/74 (EP);
B65H2301/5305 (EP);
B65H2701/31 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, IT, LI [1995/35] | Title | German: | ANTRIEBSEINRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN SPULKOPF | [1995/35] | English: | DRIVE MECHANISM FOR A BOBBIN HEAD | [1995/35] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE POUR TETE DE BOBINE | [1995/35] | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.1995 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/35] | 23.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.04.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2060954 (NEUMÜNSTERSCHE MASCHINEN- UND APPARATEBAU GMBH); | [A]DE1954657 (BARMAG, BARMER MASCHINENFABRIK AG); | [A]EP0272458 (MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG); | [A]CH502944 (INDUSTRIE-WERKE KARLSRUHE AG) |