EP0710232 - MONOMERS WITH CYCLIC CARBONATE GROUPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 08.01.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.1999 | Refusal of application | published on 24.02.1999 [1999/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/19] | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee D-51373 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PODSZUN, Wolfgang Roggendorfstrasse 55 D-51061 Köln / DE | 02 /
HEILIGER, Ludger Carl-Rumpff-Strasse 8 D-51373 Leverkusen / DE | 03 /
MÜLLER, Michael Richard-Zanders-Strasse 55 D-51469 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 04 /
CASSER, Carl Wolfskaul 7 D-51061 Köln / DE | 05 /
BRUDER, Friedrich Bodelschwingstrasse 20 D-47800 Krefeld / DE | [1996/19] | Application number, filing date | 94924737.3 | 11.07.1994 | [1996/19] | WO1994EP02266 | Priority number, date | DE19934324614 | 22.07.1993 Original published format: DE 4324614 | [1996/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9503294 | Date: | 02.02.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0710232 | Date: | 08.05.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C07D307/33, G03F7/004, G03F7/027 | [1996/19] | CPC: |
G03F7/027 (EP,US);
C07D317/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1996/19] | Title | German: | MONOMERE MIT CYCLISCHEN CARBONATGRUPPEN | [1996/19] | English: | MONOMERS WITH CYCLIC CARBONATE GROUPS | [1996/19] | French: | MONOMERES CONTENANT DES GROUPES CARBONATE CYCLIQUES | [1996/19] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.1996 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/19] | 23.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1999/08] | 09.10.1998 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1999/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS [A] 1-3 |