EP0715635 - WATER-SOLUBLE COPOLYMERIZATES CONTAINING CARBOXYL GROUPS, METHODS OF PRODUCING SAID COPOLYMERIZATES, AND USE THEREOF AS SCALE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [1998/15] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [1996/24] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DENZINGER, Walter Wormser Landstrasse 65 D-67346 Speyer / DE | 02 /
HARTMANN, Heinrich Weinheimer Strasse 46 D-67117 Limburgerhof / DE | 03 /
POTTHOFF-KARL, Birgit Gruenerstrasse 7 D-67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | 04 /
BUECHNER, Karl-Heinz Kirchfeldring 14a D-68804 Altlu heim / DE | 05 /
HEIDER, Marc Dr.-Semmelweis-Strasse 6 D-67433 Neustadt / DE | 06 /
RAUBENHEIMER, Hans-Juergen Benzstrasse 6 D-68775 Ketsch / DE | [1996/24] | Application number, filing date | 94924878.5 | 16.08.1994 | [1996/24] | WO1994EP02721 | Priority number, date | DE19934328817 | 27.08.1993 Original published format: DE 4328817 | [1996/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9506074 | Date: | 02.03.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0715635 | Date: | 12.06.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0715635 | Date: | 08.04.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C08F220/04, C02F5/10 | [1996/24] | CPC: |
C02F5/10 (EP,US);
C02F1/042 (EP,US);
C08F220/04 (EP,US);
C08F222/06 (EP,US);
C09K8/528 (EP,US);
Y02A20/124 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1996/24] | Title | German: | WASSERLÖSLICHE, CARBOXYLGRUPPEN ENTHALTENDE COPOLYMERISATE, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS SCALEINHIBITOR | [1996/24] | English: | WATER-SOLUBLE COPOLYMERIZATES CONTAINING CARBOXYL GROUPS, METHODS OF PRODUCING SAID COPOLYMERIZATES, AND USE THEREOF AS SCALE INHIBITORS | [1996/24] | French: | COPOLYMERISATS SOLUBLES DANS L'EAU CONTENANT LES GROUPES CARBOXYLE, LEUR PROCEDE DE PREPARATION ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME AGENTS ANTI-TARTRE | [1996/24] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.1996 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/24] | 27.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.08.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 08.04.1998 | IT | 08.04.1998 | BE | 31.08.1998 | CH | 31.08.1998 | LI | 31.08.1998 | [2002/26] |
Former [2000/52] | IT | 08.04.1998 | |
BE | 31.08.1998 | ||
CH | 31.08.1998 | ||
LI | 31.08.1998 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 08.04.1998 | |
BE | 31.08.1998 | ||
Former [1999/32] | BE | 31.08.1998 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0315167 (NIPPON OILS & FATS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2 * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 4; examples 7,12,14 *; | [X]EP0216479 (ALLIED COLLOIDS LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2 * page 9, line 1 - page 10, line 24 * * claim -; table - *; | [X]JPS64109 ; | [A]EP0123108 (KAO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]US4151341 (EVANI SYAMALARAO [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * column A; example -; claim - * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 89, no. 07, Database accession no. 89-050519, & JPS64109 A 00000000 (NIPPON OIL) [X] 1,2 * abstract * |