EP0705843 - BACTERIOCIN FROM ENTEROCOCCUS FEACIUM ACTIVE AGAINST LISTERIA MONOCYTOGENES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.08.1998 [1998/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSTITUT DE RECERCA I TECNOLOGIA AGROALIMENTARIES (IRTA) P de Gracia, 44, 3 08008 Barcelona / ES | For all designated states Casa Tarradellas, S.A. Apdo, correos 326 E-08500 Vic / ES | [N/P] |
Former [1996/15] | For all designated states INSTITUT DE RECERCA I TECNOLOGIA AGROALIMENTARIES (IRTA) P de Gracia, 44, 3 E-08008 Barcelona / ES | ||
For all designated states Casa Tarradellas, S.A. Apdo, correos 326 E-08500 Vic / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUGAS MAURICI, Marta Apdo. correos 326 E-08500 Vic / ES | 02 /
GARRIGA TURON, Margarita Apdo. correos 326 E-08500 Vic / ES | 03 /
MONFORT BOLIVAR, Josep M Apdo. correos 326 E-08500 Vic / ES | 04 /
YLLA ULLASTRE, Josep Apdo. correos 326 E-08500 Vic / ES | [1996/15] | Representative(s) | Urizar Anasagasti, José Antonio URYAS P.O. Box 61051 28080 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [1996/15] | Urizar Anasagasti, José Antonio URYAS P.O. Box 61051 E-28080 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 94924890.0 | 29.08.1994 | [1996/15] | WO1994ES00081 | Priority number, date | ES19930001882 | 31.08.1993 Original published format: ES 9301882 | [1996/15] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9506663 | Date: | 09.03.1995 | [1995/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0705843 | Date: | 10.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/315, A23L3/3526 | [1996/15] | CPC: |
C07K14/315 (EP);
A23L3/34635 (EP);
A23L3/3526 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT [1996/32] |
Former [1996/15] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, LI, PT, SE | Title | German: | EIN AUS ENTEROCOCCUS FAECIUM STAMMENDES GEGEN LISTERIA MONOCYTOGENES WIRKSAMES BAKTERIOCIN | [1996/15] | English: | BACTERIOCIN FROM ENTEROCOCCUS FEACIUM ACTIVE AGAINST LISTERIA MONOCYTOGENES | [1996/15] | French: | BACTERIOCINE ACTIVE CONTRE LISTERIA MONOCYTOGENES OBTENUE A PARTIR D'UNE SOUCHE D'ENTEROCOCCUS FEACIUM | [1996/15] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.1995 | Translation filed | 14.09.1995 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.1995 | Examination requested [1996/15] | 17.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/34] | 06.03.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1996 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.02.1997 | 31.08.1997 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP0493779 (QUEST INTERNATIONAL) [AD] 1-10 * page 12 * | [X] - PARENTE, E. ET AL, "Characterization of enterocin 1146, a bacteriocin from Enterococcus faecium inhibitory to Listeria monocytogenes", JOURNAL OF FOOD PROTECTION, IOWA, USA, (1992), vol. 55, no. 7, pages 497 - 502 [X] 1-10 * the whole document * | [A] - KRÄMER, J. ET AL, "Purification and characterization of two bacteriocins from Streptococcus faecium", THE JOURNAL OF GENERAL MICROBIOLOGY, CAMBRIDGE, GB, (1975), vol. 88, pages 93 - 100 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |