EP0747518 - HEAT-BONDABLE WOVEN OR KNITTED FABRIC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.04.2003 [2003/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KOHEI CO., LTD. 43-3, Sotohizumi-i, Nanatsuka-machi, Kahoku-gun Ishikawa 929-11 / JP | [1996/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOTO, Shinsuke, Kohei Co., Ltd. 43-3, Sotohizumi-i, Nanatsuka-machi Kahoku-gun, Ishikawa 929-11 / JP | 02 /
TAMURA, Makoto Marubeni Co., Ltd., 5-7, Honmachi 2-chome Chuoh-ku, Osaka 541-88 / JP | 03 /
TANAKA, Toyoaki, Marubeni Co., Ltd. Kanazawa Branch, 6-10, Konohana-cho Kanazawa-shi, Ishikawa 920 / JP | [1996/50] | Representative(s) | Gordon, Richard John Albert, et al Barker Brettell LLP 10-12 Priests Bridge London SW15 5JE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/28] | Gordon, Richard John Albert, et al Barker Brettell 10-12 Priests Bridge London SW15 5JE / GB | ||
Former [1996/50] | Gordon, Richard John Albert, et al Lorenz & Gordon, 17, Richmond Hill London Borough of, Richmond-upon-Thames TW10 6RE / GB | Application number, filing date | 94925018.7 | 29.08.1994 | [1996/50] | WO1994JP01421 | Priority number, date | JP19930238735 | 30.08.1993 Original published format: JP 23873593 | [1996/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9506768 | Date: | 09.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0747518 | Date: | 11.12.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0747518 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.03.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | D03D15/00 | [1996/50] | CPC: |
D03D15/49 (EP);
D03D15/283 (EP,US);
D03D15/47 (EP,US);
D03D15/587 (EP,US);
D10B2321/022 (EP);
D10B2331/04 (EP);
D10B2401/041 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | GB [1996/50] | Title | German: | HEISS VERSCHWEISBARER WEB- ODER STRICKSTOFF | [1996/50] | English: | HEAT-BONDABLE WOVEN OR KNITTED FABRIC | [1996/50] | French: | TEXTILE THERMOCOLLABLE DU TYPE TISSE OU A MAILLES | [1996/50] | Entry into regional phase | 02.04.1996 | Translation filed | 25.03.1996 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.1996 | Search fee paid | 25.03.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 02.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/50] | 01.07.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: EURO-PCT translation(s) not filed | 15.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 23.10.1996 | M01   Fee paid on   06.11.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2739782 (PAYEN & CIE L) [X] 1,2* page 9; claims 1-6 *; | [X]WO8912707 (HAGIHARA IND [JP]) [X] 1,2 * abstract *; | [X]GB2247696 (MEADOX MEDICALS INC [US]) [X] 1,2 * page 8, line 26 - page 9, line 35; figures 1-3 * | International search | [X]JPS5756780U ; | [Y]JPS6147847 (CHISSO CORP); | [Y]JPH0433977 (KURARAY CO); | [Y]JPH04136232 (KANEBO LTD) |