EP0676276 - FUEL HOSE, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME, AND APPARATUS THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 26.05.2004 [2004/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOKAI RUBBER INDUSTRIES, LTD. 3600, Aza-Utazu Oaza-Kitatoyama Komaki-shi Aichi 485 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/41] | For all designated states TOKAI RUBBER INDUSTRIES, LTD. 3600, Aza-Utazu Oaza-Kitatoyama Komaki-shi Aichi 485 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOKOE, Katsuhiko 2480, Sennonji Tomita-cho Nakagawa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 454 / JP | 02 /
KATO, Kazuhiro 1-1504, Kanosato Nakagawa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 454 / JP | 03 /
MURAKAMI, Koyo 2-49, Harusato-cho Chikusa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 464 / JP | 04 /
DAIKAI, Eiichi Tokai Rubber Industries Kikukawa Dormitory 20, Higashiyashiki Haguroshinden Inuyama-shi Aichi 484 / JP | 05 /
ITO, Hiroaki Chuodai Apartment House 228-211 2-3-2, Chuodai Kasugai-shi Aichi 487 / JP | [1995/41] | Representative(s) | Wakerley, Helen Rachael Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/41] | Wakerley, Helen Rachael Reddie & Grose, 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 94926384.2 | 09.09.1994 | [1995/41] | WO1994JP01501 | Priority number, date | JP19930225980 | 10.09.1993 Original published format: JP 22598093 | JP19930307414 | 12.11.1993 Original published format: JP 30741493 | JP19930339245 | 03.12.1993 Original published format: JP 33924593 | [1995/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9507176 | Date: | 16.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0676276 | Date: | 11.10.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0676276 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.03.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B29D23/00, B32B1/08, F16L11/04, C08J7/00, F16J15/16, C23C14/56, // B29K27:12 | [1997/03] | CPC: |
B32B25/08 (EP,US);
B29D23/00 (KR);
B29C48/0016 (EP,US);
B29C48/09 (EP,US);
B29C48/151 (EP,US);
B29C48/21 (EP,US);
B29C59/142 (EP,US);
B29D23/001 (EP,US);
B32B1/08 (EP,KR,US);
B32B25/14 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/16 (US);
B32B27/28 (EP,US);
B32B27/304 (US);
B32B27/322 (US);
B32B27/34 (EP,US);
B32B38/0008 (EP,US);
F16L11/04 (KR);
F16L11/045 (EP,US);
F16L11/125 (EP,US);
F16L11/127 (EP,US);
B29K2021/00 (EP,US);
B29K2027/12 (EP,US);
B29K2077/00 (EP,US);
B29L2009/00 (EP,US);
B29L2023/005 (EP,US);
B32B2307/202 (US);
B32B2309/105 (US);
B32B2319/00 (EP,US);
B32B2327/12 (EP,US);
B32B2597/00 (US);
F16L2011/047 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1314 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1321 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1366 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1393 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31743 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1995/41] | B29D23/00, B32B1/08, F16L11/04, C08J7/00, // B29K27:12 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/41] | Title | German: | BENZINSCHLAUCH VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [2001/24] | English: | FUEL HOSE, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME, AND APPARATUS THEREFOR | [1995/41] | French: | TUYAU D'ESSENCE ET SES PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE PRODUCTION | [1995/41] |
Former [1995/41] | BENZINSCHLAUCH VERFAHREN UND VEROORICHTUNG ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | Entry into regional phase | 09.05.1995 | Translation filed | 02.05.1995 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.1995 | Search fee paid | 02.05.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/41] | 16.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 05.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 07.06.2002 | GB | 09.09.2002 | [2004/22] |
Former [2003/30] | DE | 07.06.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1094785 (ICI LTD) [A] 11,18 * page 1, line 64 - page 2, line 41; figure . *; | [A]GB1432824 (ELECTRICITY COUNCIL, et al) [A] 18 * page 1, line 48 - page 2, line 10; figure 2 *; | [A]US4735996 (NAGAI ITSUO [JP], et al) [A] 1,2* column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 5; figure 2 *; | [A]EP0479592 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP], et al) [A] 11,18 * page 4, line 19 - line 32; figure 2; claims 1,2 *; | [A]EP0551094 (PILOT IND INC [US]) [A] 1,2,11 * page 4, line 27 - line 56 * * page 7, line 15 - line 20; figure 3 * | International search | [A]JPS5738272Y ; | [A]JPS609734 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [A]JPH01304130 (UNITIKA LTD); | [A]JPH03164246 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO) |