EP0713390 - GELATIN CAPSULES CONTAINING A HIGHLY CONCENTRATED ACETAMINOPHEN SOLUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2000 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.05.2000 [2000/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states R.P. SCHERER CORPORATION 2075 West Big Beaver Road, P.O. Box 7060 Troy Michigan 48007-7060 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/22] | For all designated states R.P. SCHERER CORPORATION 2075 West Big Beaver Road, P.O. Box 7060 Troy, Michigan 48007-7060 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHELLEY, Rickey S. 986 Wood Street Largo, FL 34640 / US | 02 /
WEI, Youching 2275 Willowbrook Drive Clearwater, FL 34624 / US | 03 /
LINKING, Deborah 315 East Medallion Boulevard Maderia Beach, FL 33708 / US | [1996/22] | Representative(s) | Cockbain, Julian Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/22] | Cockbain, Julian, Dr. Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 94926475.8 | 04.08.1994 | [1996/22] | WO1994US08790 | Priority number, date | US19930102464 | 05.08.1993 Original published format: US 102464 | US19940263630 | 22.06.1994 Original published format: US 263630 | [1996/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9504527 | Date: | 16.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0713390 | Date: | 29.05.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0713390 | Date: | 09.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/165, A61K9/48 | [1996/22] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K9/48 (KR);
A61K31/165 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/485 (EP,US);
A61K9/4858 (EP,US);
A61K9/4866 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/485, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/485, A61K31/44, A61K31/165, A61K31/135 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1996/22] | Title | German: | GELATINEKAISELN DIE EINE HOCHDOSIERTE ACETAMINOPHENLÖSUNG ENTHALTEN | [1996/22] | English: | GELATIN CAPSULES CONTAINING A HIGHLY CONCENTRATED ACETAMINOPHEN SOLUTION | [1996/22] | French: | CAPSULES DE GELATINE CONTENANT UNE SOLUTION D'ACETAMINOPHENE FORTEMENT CONCENTREE | [1996/22] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.1996 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/22] | 18.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 23.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 10.12.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0243930 (PHARMACAPS INC [US]) [X] 1-20 * column 2, line 31 - line 34 * * column 4, line 26 - column 5, line 47 * * column 6, line 49 - column 7, line 43 * * example 1 * |