EP0716619 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR MIXING AND DISPENSING MULTI-PART COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.06.2001 [2001/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ultradent Products, Inc. 505 West 10200 South South Jordan Utah 84065 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/25] | For all designated states ULTRADENT PRODUCTS, INC. 505 West 10200 South South Jordan, Utah 84065 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FISHER, Dan, E. 10444 South Dimple Dell Road Sandy, UT 84093 / US | [1996/25] | Representative(s) | Orr, William McLean, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/30] | Orr, William McLean, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, Tower House, Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [1996/25] | Vinsome, Rex Martin, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, Tower House, Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 94926685.2 | 02.09.1994 | [1996/25] | WO1994US09983 | Priority number, date | US19930117217 | 03.09.1993 Original published format: US 117217 | US19940270924 | 05.07.1994 Original published format: US 270924 | [1996/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9506495 | Date: | 09.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0716619 | Date: | 19.06.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.03.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61M37/00, B05C17/005, A61C9/00, A61M5/315 | [1997/16] | CPC: |
B05C17/00593 (EP,US);
A61C5/64 (EP,US);
A61C9/0026 (EP,US);
B05C17/00516 (EP,US);
A61M5/19 (EP,US);
A61M5/31596 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1996/25] | A61M37/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/25] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUM MISCHEN UND ABGEBEN VON MULTITEILZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [1996/25] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR MIXING AND DISPENSING MULTI-PART COMPOSITIONS | [1996/25] | French: | PROCEDES ET APPAREIL DE MELANGE ET DE DISTRIBUTION DE COMPOSITIONS FORMEES DE PLUSIEURS CONSTITUANTS | [1996/25] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.1996 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.1996 | Search fee paid | 12.02.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.12.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 12.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/25] | 27.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/24] | 15.01.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2001/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3606094 (MILLS PETER B, et al) [X] 1-3,6 * column W *; | [X]US3815878 (BASKAS M, et al) [X] 1,6 * column W *; | [A]US4159570 (BASKAS MORRIS J, et al) [A] 1,6* column W * | International search | [A]US4392850 (ELIAS ALLEN M, et al); | [A]US4871354 (CONN KIRK O [US], et al); | [A]US4979941 (OGLE II GEORGE B [US]) |