EP0723840 - MANIPULATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.03.1999 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KOMATSU LTD. 3-6 Akasaka 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8414 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/31] | For all designated states KOMATSU LTD. 3-6 Akasaka 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHINADA, Hiroshi, c/o K.K. Komatsu Seisakusho Chuokenkyusho, 1200 Manda Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa 254 / JP | 02 /
ASHIKAGA, Shigeaki, c/o K.K. Komatsu Seisakusho Chuokenkyusho, 1200, Manda Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa 254 / JP | 03 /
OKAMURA, Kenji, c/o K.K. Komatsu Seisakusho Chuokenkyusho, 1200, Manda Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa 254 / JP | 04 /
OTSUBO, Kazuhiko, c/o K.K. Komatsu Seisakusho Chuokenkyusho, 1200, Manda Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa 254 / JP | 05 /
KATO, Toshio, c/o K.K. Komatsu Seisakusho Awazu Works, 23, tsu, Futsu-machi Komatsu-shi, Ishikawa 923-03 / JP | 06 /
KITA, Ikuo, c/o K.K. Komatsu Seisakusho Awazu Works, 23, tsu Futsu-machi Komatsu-shi, Ishikawa 923-03 / JP | 07 /
OURA, Minoru, c/o K.K. Komatsu Seisakusho Awazu Works, 23, tsu Futsu-machi Komatsu-shi, Ishikawa 923-03 / JP | 08 /
TAKEUCHI, Shinji 406, Imae-machi 9-chome Komatsu-shi, Ishikawa 923 / JP | [1996/42] |
Former [1996/31] | 01 /
YOSHINADA, Hiroshi Kabushiki Kaisha Komatsu Seisakusho Chuokenkyusho 1200, Manda Hiratsuka-shi KanaGawa 254 / JP | ||
02 /
ASHIKAGA, Shigeaki Kabushiki Kaisha Komatsu Seisakusho Chuokenkyusho 1200, Manda Hiratsuka-shi KanaGawa 254 / JP | |||
03 /
OKAMURA, Kenji Kabushiki Kaisha Komatsu Seisakusho Chuokenkyusho 1200, Manda Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawaa 254 / JP | |||
04 /
OTSUBO, Kazuhiko Kabushiki Kaisha Komatsu Seisakusho Chuokenkyusho 1200, Manda Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254 / JP | |||
05 /
KATO, Toshio Awazu Works of Kabushiki Kaisha Komatsu Seisakusho 23, tsu Futsu-machi Komatsu-shi Ishikawa / JP | |||
06 /
KITA, Ikuo Awazu Works of Kabushiki Kaisha Komatsu Seisakusho 23, tsu Futsu-machi Komatsu-shi Ishikawa / JP | |||
07 /
OURA, Minoru Awazu Works of Kabushiki Kaisha Komatsu Seisakusho 23, tsu Futsu-machi Komatsu-shi Ishikawa / JP | |||
08 /
TAKEUCHI, Shinji 406, Imae-machi 9-chome Komatsu-shi Ishikawa 923 / JP | Representative(s) | Fiener, Josef Patentanw. J. Fiener et col. P.O. Box 12 49 87712 Mindelheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/27] | Fiener, Josef Patentanw. J. Fiener et col., P.O. Box 12 49 87712 Mindelheim / DE | ||
Former [1996/43] | Fiener, Josef European Patent Attorney, Maximilianstrasse 57, Postfach 1249 D-87712 Mindelheim / DE | ||
Former [1996/42] | Fiener, Josef Patentanwälte Kahler, Käck & Fiener Maximilianstrasse 57 Postfach 12 49 D-87712 Mindelheim / DE | ||
Former [1996/31] | Fiener, Josef European Patent Attorney, Maximilanstrasse 57, Postfach 1249 D-87712 Mindelheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 94926704.1 | 13.07.1994 | [1996/31] | WO1994JP01147 | Priority number, date | JP19930173085 | 13.07.1993 Original published format: JP 17308593 | JP19930253427 | 08.10.1993 Original published format: JP 25342793 | JP19930258457 | 15.10.1993 Original published format: JP 25845793 | [1996/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9502487 | Date: | 26.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0723840 | Date: | 31.07.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.01.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B25J3/04, B25J13/08, E02F9/20 | [1996/49] | CPC: |
B25J13/088 (EP);
B25J3/04 (EP);
B25J9/1065 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1996/31] | B25J9/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/31] | Title | German: | MANIPULATOR | [1996/31] | English: | MANIPULATOR | [1996/31] | French: | MANIPULATEUR | [1996/31] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.1996 | Translation filed | 08.02.1996 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.1996 | Search fee paid | 08.02.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 08.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/31] | 13.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 26.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.12.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1999/19] | 20.12.1998 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1999/19] | Request for further processing for: | 26.03.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 26.03.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.04.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3630389 (SCHMIDT) [A] 1 * column 3, line 8 - line 75 *; | [AP]JPH0695728 | [AP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940708), vol. 18, no. 365, Database accession no. (P - 1767), & JP0695728 A 19940408 (HITACHI) [AP] 6 * abstract * | International search | [XY]JPS63100176U ; | [Y]JPS5037280U ; | [Y]JPS56151788U ; | [Y]JPH0271979 ; | [Y]JPS5096796 |