EP0722611 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRODUCTION OF RADIOACTIVE IODINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.1999 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states McMASTER UNIVERSITY 1200 Main Street West Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1996/30] | For all designated states McMASTER UNIVERSITY 1200 Main Street West Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASSAL, Scott, Bradley 79 Bond Street North Hamilton, Ontario L8S 3W4 / CA | [1996/30] | Representative(s) | Lee, Nicholas John Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/30] | Lee, Nicholas John Haseltine Lake & Co., Hazlitt House, 28 Southampton Buildings, Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 94926753.8 | 16.09.1994 | [1996/30] | WO1994CA00511 | Priority number, date | US19930130726 | 04.10.1993 Original published format: US 130726 | [1996/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9510114 | Date: | 13.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0722611 | Date: | 24.07.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0722611 | Date: | 08.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G21G1/06, G21G4/08 | [1996/30] | CPC: |
G21G4/08 (EP,US);
G21G1/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/30] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON RADIOAKTIVEM IOD | [1996/30] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRODUCTION OF RADIOACTIVE IODINE | [1996/30] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE PRODUCTION D'IODE RADIOACTIF | [1996/30] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.1996 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/30] | 27.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.12.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.07.1998 | CH | 08.07.1998 | ES | 08.07.1998 | GR | 08.07.1998 | IT | 08.07.1998 | LI | 08.07.1998 | IE | 16.09.1998 | LU | 16.09.1998 | DK | 08.10.1998 | PT | 08.10.1998 | MC | 31.03.1999 | [2008/05] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 08.07.1998 | |
CH | 08.07.1998 | ||
ES | 08.07.1998 | ||
GR | 08.07.1998 | ||
LI | 08.07.1998 | ||
IE | 16.09.1998 | ||
LU | 16.09.1998 | ||
DK | 08.10.1998 | ||
PT | 08.10.1998 | ||
MC | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 08.07.1998 | |
CH | 08.07.1998 | ||
ES | 08.07.1998 | ||
GR | 08.07.1998 | ||
LI | 08.07.1998 | ||
IE | 16.09.1998 | ||
LU | 30.09.1998 | ||
DK | 08.10.1998 | ||
PT | 08.10.1998 | ||
MC | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [2003/18] | AT | 08.07.1998 | |
CH | 08.07.1998 | ||
ES | 08.07.1998 | ||
GR | 08.07.1998 | ||
LI | 08.07.1998 | ||
IE | 16.09.1998 | ||
LU | 30.09.1998 | ||
PT | 08.10.1998 | ||
MC | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [2003/17] | AT | 08.07.1998 | |
CH | 08.07.1998 | ||
ES | 08.07.1998 | ||
GR | 08.07.1998 | ||
LI | 08.07.1998 | ||
IE | 16.09.1998 | ||
LU | 30.09.1998 | ||
PT | 08.10.1998 | ||
MC | 06.04.1999 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 08.07.1998 | |
CH | 08.07.1998 | ||
ES | 08.07.1998 | ||
GR | 08.07.1998 | ||
LI | 08.07.1998 | ||
IE | 16.09.1998 | ||
LU | 30.09.1998 | ||
PT | 08.10.1998 | ||
MC | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 08.07.1998 | |
CH | 08.07.1998 | ||
GR | 08.07.1998 | ||
LI | 08.07.1998 | ||
IE | 16.09.1998 | ||
LU | 30.09.1998 | ||
PT | 08.10.1998 | ||
MC | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 08.07.1998 | |
GR | 08.07.1998 | ||
IE | 16.09.1998 | ||
LU | 30.09.1998 | ||
PT | 08.10.1998 | ||
CH | 13.10.1998 | ||
LI | 13.10.1998 | ||
MC | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [2000/20] | AT | 08.07.1998 | |
GR | 08.07.1998 | ||
IE | 16.09.1998 | ||
LU | 30.09.1998 | ||
PT | 08.10.1998 | ||
MC | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 08.07.1998 | |
GR | 08.07.1998 | ||
LU | 30.09.1998 | ||
PT | 08.10.1998 | ||
MC | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [1999/29] | AT | 08.07.1998 | |
PT | 08.10.1998 | ||
MC | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [1999/26] | AT | 08.07.1998 | |
MC | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [1999/22] | AT | 08.07.1998 | Cited in | International search | [A] - Hradilek, P. et al, "Preparation of iodine-125 from irradiated XeF2. Priprava jodu-125 z ozareneho XeF2.", INIS, INTERNATIONAL ATOMIC ENERGY AGENCY (IAEA), VIENNA, AT [A] * abstract * | [ ] - RADIOISOTOPY. (AUG 1985) V. 26(1) P. 28-37. CODEN: RAISBC ISSN: 0322-8657, CZECHOSLOVAKIA | [A] - Pasi, M. et al, "Production of pure iodine-125 from irradiated compressed xenon-gas.", INIS, INTERNATIONAL ATOMIC ENERGY AGENCY (IAEA), VIENNA, AT [A] * abstract * | [ ] - 1980 JOINT ANNUAL MEETING. ISRAEL NUCLEAR SOCIETY, YAVNE;ISRAEL HEALTH PHYSICS SOCIETY; RADIATION RESEARCH SOCIETY OF ISRAEL 1980. P. 175-176 OF 312 P. PUBLISHED IN SUMMARY FORM ONLY. SER. TITLE: TRANSACTIONS. V. 8. CONFERENCE: ISRAEL NUCLEAR SOCIETI, ISRAEL | [A] - QAIM ET AL, "HALF-LIVES AND ACTIVATION CROSS-SECTIONS OF SOME RADIO-ISOTOPES OF IODINE, TELLURIUM AND ANTIMONY FORMED IN THE INTERACTION OF IODINE WITH 14.7 MeV NEUTRONS", JOURNAL OF INORGANIC AND NUCLEAR CHEMISTRY, UK, (1968), vol. 30, no. 10, pages 2577 - 2581 [A] * the whole document * | [A] - MARTHINO ET AL, "I-125 PRODUCTION : NEUTRON IRRADIATION PLANNING", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF APPLIED RADIATION AND ISOTOPES., UK, (1984), vol. 35, no. 10, pages 933 - 938 [A] * the whole document * | Examination | - JOURNAL OF INORGANIC AND NUCLEAR CHEMISTRY, vol.30, no.10, 1968UK pages 2577 - 2581 QAIM ET AL 'HALF-LIVES AND ACTIVATION CROSS-SECTIONS OF SOME RADIO- | - ISOTOPES OF IODINETELLURIUM AND ANTIMONY FORMED IN THE INTERACTION OF IODINE WITH 14.7 MeV NEUTRONS' |