EP0720726 - PROCESS AND CIRCUIT FOR PROTECTING A HEATED TEMPERATURE-DEPENDENT SENSOR RESISTOR AGAINST OVERHEATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.05.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.07.1998 [1998/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/28] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHIFFERL, Ludwig Föhrenweg 3e D-93080 Pentling / DE | 02 /
WILDGEN, Andreas Am Grund 7 D-93152 Nittendorf / DE | [1996/28] | Application number, filing date | 94926794.2 | 19.09.1994 | [1996/28] | WO1994DE01083 | Priority number, date | DE19934332412 | 23.09.1993 Original published format: DE 4332412 | [1996/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9508753 | Date: | 30.03.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0720726 | Date: | 10.07.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.03.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0720726 | Date: | 23.07.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/698, F02D41/18 | [1996/28] | CPC: |
F02D41/222 (EP,US);
G01F1/698 (EP,KR,US);
F02D41/18 (KR);
F02D41/187 (EP,US);
G01D3/036 (EP,US);
Y02T10/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/28] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG ZUM SCHUTZ EINES BEHEIZTEN TEMPERATURABHÄNGIGEN SENSORWIDERSTANDS VOR ÜBERHITZUNG | [1996/28] | English: | PROCESS AND CIRCUIT FOR PROTECTING A HEATED TEMPERATURE-DEPENDENT SENSOR RESISTOR AGAINST OVERHEATING | [1996/28] | French: | PROCEDE ET CIRCUIT DE PROTECTION CONTRE D'EVENTUELLES SURCHAUFFES D'UNE RESISTANCE A CAPTEUR, CHAUFFEE EN FONCTION DE LA TEMPERATURE | [1996/28] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.1996 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/29] | 13.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 23.07.1997 | [1998/15] | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3932304 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,2 * page 3, line 11 - line 31; figure 1 *; | [DA]DE3022685 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DA] 1,2,4,5 * page 4, paragraph 2 - page 8, paragraph 1; figures 1,3 *; | [A]JPS60154116 ; | [A]JPS62195524 ; | [DA]DE3207394 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DA] 1,2 * page 8, paragraph 2 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851224), vol. 9, no. 329, Database accession no. (P - 416)<2052> , & JP60154116 A 19850813 (NIHON DENSHI) [A] 1-3 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880213), vol. 12, no. 48, Database accession no. (P - 666)<2895> , & JP62195524 A 19870828 (JAPAN ELECTRONIC CONTROL) [A] 1,2 * abstract * | Examination | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9no. 329 (P-416) (2052) 24. Dezember 1985 & | - JP,A,60 154 116 (NIHON DENSHI) 13. August 1985 |