EP0719286 - DEXTRAN ESTERS, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THEM AND THEIR USE FOR ENCASING AND ENCAPSULATING MEDICAMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/27] | DEXTRANE ESTERS, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THEM AND THEIR USE FOR ENCASING AND ENCAPSULATING MEDICAMENTS | ||
[1997/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [1997/49] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [1996/27] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHEHLMANN, Volker Feuerbachstr. 8a D-67354 Römerberg / DE | 02 /
BAUER, Kurt, Heinz Im Finkeler 4 D-79112 Freiburg / DE | 03 /
KESSELHUT, Jan-Frederic Freytagstrasse 5 D-79114 Freiburg / DE | [1997/49] |
Former [1996/27] | 01 /
SCHEHLMANN, Volker Landteilstrasse 17 D-68163 Mannheim / DE | ||
02 /
BAUER, Kurt, Heinz Im Finkeler 4 D-79112 Freiburg / DE | |||
03 /
KESSELHUT, Jan-Frederic Freytagstrasse 5 D-79114 Freiburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 94926923.7 | 07.09.1994 | [1996/27] | WO1994EP02988 | Priority number, date | DE19934331539 | 17.09.1993 Original published format: DE 4331539 | [1996/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9507936 | Date: | 23.03.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0719286 | Date: | 03.07.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0719286 | Date: | 03.12.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C08B37/00, A61K9/16, A61K9/20, A61K9/28, A61K9/50 | [1996/27] | CPC: |
A61K9/286 (EP,US);
A61K9/205 (EP,US);
C08B37/0021 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1996/27] | Title | German: | DEXTRANESTER, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ZUR UMHÜLLUNG ODER EINBETTUNG VON ARZNEIMITTELN | [1996/27] | English: | DEXTRAN ESTERS, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THEM AND THEIR USE FOR ENCASING AND ENCAPSULATING MEDICAMENTS | [1997/49] | French: | ESTERS DE DEXTRANE, LEUR PROCEDE DE PREPARATION ET LEUR UTILISATION POUR ENROBER OU ENCAPSULER DES MEDICAMENTS | [1996/27] |
Former [1996/27] | DEXTRANE ESTERS, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THEM AND THEIR USE FOR ENCASING AND ENCAPSULATING MEDICAMENTS | Entry into regional phase | 29.02.1996 | National basic fee paid | 29.02.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.02.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/27] | 26.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.09.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 03.12.1997 | SE | 03.03.1998 | [2003/08] |
Former [1998/35] | SE | 03.03.1998 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2954372 (NOVAK LEO J, et al) [A] 1,5 * claim - *; | [A]EP0095968 (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR]) [A] 1 * page 8, line 9 - line 12 * * examples 3,6 *; | [A]WO9200732 (KABI PHARMACIA AB [SE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 3, line 26 - line 29 *; | [A]WO9213006 (COLETICA [FR]) [A] 1-3,5 * abstract ** claims 1-5,7,13 *; | [X]DE4136324 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 1,5 * page 2, line 62 - page 3, line 44 * * page 2, line 66 - line 68 * * page 7; examples 2,3,4 * * abstract * |