EP0719133 - SKIN CARE METHOD AND COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.05.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.07.1998 [1998/29] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | For:CH
DE
ES
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1996/27] | For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:CH
DE
ES
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAWLINGS, Anthony, Vincent 509 Spencer Drive Wyckoff, NJ 07481 / US | 02 /
WATKINSON, Allan 20 Hunts Path Oakley Bedford MK43 7SR / GB | [1996/27] | Representative(s) | Evans, Jacqueline Gail Victoria, et al Unilever plc Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/27] | Evans, Jacqueline Gail Victoria, et al Unilever plc Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 94926926.0 | 08.09.1994 | [1996/27] | WO1994EP03001 | Priority number, date | GB19930019103 | 15.09.1993 Original published format: GB 9319103 | GB19940005639 | 22.03.1994 Original published format: GB 9405639 | [1996/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9507688 | Date: | 23.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0719133 | Date: | 03.07.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/48, A61K38/48 | [1996/27] | CPC: |
A61Q5/006 (EP,US);
A61K38/465 (EP,US);
A61K38/47 (EP,US);
A61K38/50 (EP,US);
A61K8/66 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K38/465, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K38/47, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K38/50, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1996/27] | Title | German: | HAUTPFLEGEVERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [1996/27] | English: | SKIN CARE METHOD AND COMPOSITION | [1996/27] | French: | SOIN POUR LA PEAU ET COMPOSITION | [1996/27] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.1996 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.04.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/27] | 07.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/29] | 14.01.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS5221844 ; | [A]JPS5877808 ; | [A]JPS5920211 ; | [A]LU61123 (BLENDAX-WERKE) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0498532 (SQUIBB & SONS INC [US]) [A] 1,8,9 * claim - *; | [PX]WO9319732 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [PX] 1,3-6,8,9 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO9319731 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [PX] 1,3-6,8,9 * the whole document *; | [PA]DE4305460 (SCHELLER ALBERT DR [DE]) [PA] 1,8,9* the whole document * | [DA] - LUNDSTRÖM ET AL., "stratum corneum chymotryptic enzyme", ACTA DERMATO-VENEREOLOGICA, STOCKHOLM SE, (1991), vol. 71, no. 6, pages 471 - 474 [DA] 1,2 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 17, no. 674, Database accession no. (C - 1140), & JP52021844 A 19930831 (KYOEI KAGAKU KOGYO KK) [A] 1-9 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 83, no. 25, Database accession no. 83-59509K, & JPS5877808 A 19830511 (KAKUDAI SHOSAN KK) [A] 1-9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 106, Database accession no. (C - 223), & JP59020211 A 19840201 (AYUKAWA TAIZOU) [A] 1-9 * abstract * |