EP0717793 - DEVICE FOR ANODIC OXIDATION OF WORKPIECES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.1998 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.04.1998 [1998/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STOHRER-DODUCO GmbH & Co. Gutenbergstrasse 16 D-71277 Rutesheim / DE | [1996/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEINS, Helmut Genner Staffel 4 D-75378 Bad Liebenzell / DE | [1996/26] | Representative(s) | Twelmeier, Ulrich, et al Zerrennerstrasse 23-25 75172 Pforzheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/26] | Twelmeier, Ulrich, Dipl.Phys., et al Westliche Karl-Friedrich-Strasse 29-31 75172 Pforzheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 94926927.8 | 08.09.1994 | [1996/26] | WO1994EP03010 | Priority number, date | DE19934330346 | 08.09.1993 Original published format: DE 4330346 | DE19940005190U | 26.03.1994 Original published format: DE 9405190 U | [1996/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9507376 | Date: | 16.03.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0717793 | Date: | 26.06.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0717793 | Date: | 09.04.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C25D11/02, C25D17/06, C25D17/08 | [1996/26] | CPC: |
C25D17/06 (EP);
C25D11/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, LI, NL [1996/26] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM ANODISCHEN OXIDIEREN VON WERKSTÜCKEN | [1996/26] | English: | DEVICE FOR ANODIC OXIDATION OF WORKPIECES | [1996/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'OXYDATION ANODIQUE DE PIECES | [1996/26] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.1996 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/26] | 09.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5084155 (ENGWALL DWIGHT L [US]) [A] 1; | [A]US5076903 (WESTIN RICHARD A [US]) [A] 1; | [A]US4664771 (DOCKTOR KENNETH E [US], et al) [A] 1 |