EP0722399 - POWER-ASSISTED BRAKING SYSTEM WITH AUTOMATIC CONTROL AND CONTROLLED RESERVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1998 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.05.1998 [1998/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bosch Systemes de Freinage 126 rue de Stalingrad 93700 Drancy / FR | [1997/10] |
Former [1996/30] | For all designated states ALLIEDSIGNAL EUROPE SERVICES TECHNIQUES 126 rue de Stalingrad 93700 Drancy / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CASTEL, Philippe 8, rue Monge F-75005 Paris / FR | 02 /
DOUILLET, Christian 5, rue Lavoisier F-92800 Puteaux / FR | 03 /
KERVAGORET, Gilbert 5, impasse Nobleterre F-95100 Argenteuil / FR | [1996/30] | Representative(s) | Bentz, Jean-Paul, et al BOSCH SYSTEMES DE FREINAGE 126 rue de Stalingrad 93700 Drancy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/10] | Bentz, Jean-Paul, et al BOSCH SYSTEMES DE FREINAGE, 126 rue de Stalingrad 93700 Drancy / FR | ||
Former [1996/30] | Bentz, Jean-Paul AlliedSignal Europe Services Techniques Service Brevets 126, Rue de Stalingrad 93700 Drancy / FR | Application number, filing date | 94926966.6 | 08.09.1994 | [1996/30] | WO1994FR01059 | Priority number, date | FR19930012088 | 12.10.1993 Original published format: FR 9312088 | [1996/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9510436 | Date: | 20.04.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0722399 | Date: | 24.07.1996 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0722399 | Date: | 04.06.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B60T13/52 | [1996/30] | CPC: |
B60T13/72 (EP,US);
B60T13/52 (KR);
B60T15/027 (EP,US);
B60T7/12 (EP,US);
B60T8/3625 (EP,US);
B60T8/4854 (EP,US);
Y10T137/86919 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1996/30] | Title | German: | BREMSKRAFTVERSTÄRKER MIT AUTOMATISCHER BETÄTIGUNG UND GEREGELTER RESERVE | [1996/30] | English: | POWER-ASSISTED BRAKING SYSTEM WITH AUTOMATIC CONTROL AND CONTROLLED RESERVE | [1996/30] | French: | SYSTEME DE FREINAGE ASSISTE A COMMANDE AUTOMATIQUE ET A RESERVE CONTROLEE | [1996/30] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.1995 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.07.1995 | Examination requested [1996/30] | 13.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.12.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0347583 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,2 * column 7, line 44 - column 8, line 3; figure 3 *; | [A]EP0435113 (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]) [A] 1,2 * column 6, line 4 - column 7, line 11; figures 2,3 *; | [A]DE3705333 (TOKICO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3605295 (TOKICO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document * |