EP0723402 - SENESCENT CELL-DERIVED INHIBITORS OF DNA SYNTHESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYLOR COLLEGE OF MEDICINE One Baylor Plaza Houston, TX 77030 / US | [1996/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, James R. 10311 Cliffwood Houston, TX 77030 / US | [1996/31] | Representative(s) | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2004/34] | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett, et al J.A. Kemp & Co 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [1996/31] | Goldin, Douglas Michael, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 94927257.9 | 26.08.1994 | [1996/31] | WO1994US09700 | Priority number, date | US19930113372 | 30.08.1993 Original published format: US 113372 | US19930153564 | 17.11.1993 Original published format: US 153564 | US19940160814 | 03.01.1994 Original published format: US 160814 | US19940203535 | 25.02.1994 Original published format: US 203535 | US19940229420 | 15.04.1994 Original published format: US 229420 | US19940268439 | 30.06.1994 Original published format: US 268439 | US19940274535 | 13.07.1994 Original published format: US 274535 | [1996/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9506415 | Date: | 09.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0723402 | Date: | 31.07.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0723402 | Date: | 18.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.03.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C12N15/11, C12N15/62, C07K14/47, C07K16/18, C07H21/00, C12Q1/68, G01N33/577, A61K31/70, A61K38/17 | [1997/49] | CPC: |
A61K31/70 (EP);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P15/16 (EP);
A61P15/18 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P17/14 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/16 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P33/02 (EP);
A61P33/12 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
B82Y5/00 (EP);
C07H21/00 (EP);
C07K14/4703 (EP);
C07K16/18 (EP);
C12N15/113 (EP);
C12Q1/6844 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6844, C12Q2527/125, C12Q2537/143, C12Q2565/629 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1996/31] | A23J1/00, A61K31/70, A61K35/14, A61K37/00, A61K39/00, A01N37/18, A01N43/04, C07H17/00, C07K1/00, C07K14/00, C07K2/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/31] | Title | German: | INHIBITOREN DER DNA SYNTHESE AUS ALTERNDEN ZELLEN | [1996/31] | English: | SENESCENT CELL-DERIVED INHIBITORS OF DNA SYNTHESIS | [1996/31] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE SYNTHESE D'ADN DERIVES DE CELLULES SENESCENTES | [1996/31] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.1996 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.1996 | Search fee paid | 25.03.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 25.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/31] | 17.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/30] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 12.03.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 12.03.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.03.2008 | Decision despatched | 19.07.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 19.07.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.10.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 08.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 07.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | 12   M06   Fee paid on   28.09.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.08.2010 | BE | 18.08.2010 | DK | 18.08.2010 | SE | 18.08.2010 | LU | 26.08.2010 | MC | 31.08.2010 | GR | 19.11.2010 | PT | 20.12.2010 | [2012/44] |
Former [2011/26] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0293249 (AMRAD CORP LTD [AU]) [Y] 6 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9303157 (DANA FARBER CANCER INST INC [US]) [Y] 6 * the whole document *; | [XY]WO9312251 (BAYLOR COLLEGE MEDICINE [US]) [X] 1-5,7-10,12-14,18-21,24,25,27,29-31,33-36,41,42 * the whole document * [Y] 6; | [PX]WO9409135 (COLD SPRING HARBOR LAB [US]) [PX] 15-21,28 * page 11, line 33 - page 12, line 20; claims 1,2 *; | [E]WO9511986 (UNIV COLUMBIA [US]) [E] 1-5,7-10,12-21,24,25,27,29-36,41,42 * page 250, line 10 - page 323, line 1; claims 58-96 *; | [E]WO9513375 (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US]) [E] 1-5,7-21,24-36,41,42* the whole document * | International search | [YP] - CELL, Volume 75, issued 19 November 1993, W.S. ELDEIRY et al., "WAF1 a Potential Mediator of P53 Tumor Suppression", pages 817-825. | [YP] - CELL, Volume 75, issued 19 November 1993, J.W. HARPER et al., "The P21 CDK-Interacting Protein CIP1 is a Potent Inhibitor of G1 Cyclin-Dependent Kinases", pages 805-816. | [YP] - EXPERIMENTAL CELL RESEARCH, Volume 211, issued March 1994, A. NODA et al., "Cloning of Senescent Cell-Derived Inhibitors of DNA Synthesis Using an Expression Screen", pages 90-98. | [YP] - NATURE, Volume 366, issued 16 December 1993, Y. XIONG et al., "P21 is a Universal Inhibitor of Cyclin Kinases", pags 701-704. | by applicant | US3773919 | US3887699 | EP0058481 | CA1176565 | EP0158277 | US5175266 | US5176996 | WO9404557 | - KLEINSEK, D.A., AGE, (1989), vol. 12, pages 55 - 60 | - GIORDANO, T. ET AL., EXPER. CELL. RES., (1989), vol. 185, pages 399 - 406 | - SIERRA, F. ET AL., MOLEC. CELL. BIOL., (1989), vol. 9, pages 5610 - 5616 | - PEREIRA-SMITH, O.M. ET AL., J CELL. BIOCHEM., (1988), page 193 | - KLEINSEK, D.A.; SMITH, J.R., AGE, (1987), vol. 10, page 125 | - XIONG, Y. ET AL., CELL, (1992), vol. 71, pages 505 - 514 | - MOTOKURA, T. ET AL., NATURE, (1991), vol. 350, pages 512 - 515 | - XIONG, Y. ET AL., CELL, (1991), vol. 65, pages 691 - 699 | - LEW, D.J. ET AL., CELL, (1991), vol. 65, pages 1197 - 1206 | - XIONG, Y. ET AL., CURR. BIOL., (1991), vol. 1, pages 362 - 364 | - MATSUSHIME, H. ET AL., CELL, (1991), vol. 65, pages 701 - 7139 | - INABA, T. ET AL., GENOMICS, (1992), vol. 13, pages 565 - 574 | - XIONG, Y. ET AL., GENOMICS, (1992), vol. 13, pages 575 - 584 | - SHERR, C.J., CELL, (1993), vol. 73, pages 1059 - 1065 | - LEW, D.J. ET AL., CELL, (1991), vol. 66, pages 1197 - 1206 | - KOFF, A. ET AL., CELL, (1991), vol. 66, pages 1217 - 1228 | - NORBURY, C. ET AL., ANN. REV. BIOCHEM., (1992), vol. 61, pages 441 - 470 | - FANG, F. ET AL., CELL, (1991), vol. 66, pages 731 - 742 | - WALKER, D.H. ET AL., NATURE, (1991), vol. 354, pages 314 - 317 | - RES., (1988), vol. 48, page 5546 | - YAKOTA, J. ET AL., PROC. NAT'L. ACAD. SCI. (U.S.A., (1987), vol. 84, page 9252 | - TOGUCHIDA ET AL., CANC. RES., (1988), vol. 48, page 3939 | - NIGRO ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 342, pages 705 - 708 | - FEARON ET AL., CELL, (1990), vol. 61, pages 759 - 767 | - TENENBAUM, L., Cancer Chemotherapy and Biotherapy A Reference Guide, W.B. SAUNDERS COMPANY, (1994), pages 3 - 13 | - U. SIDMAN ET AL., BIOPOLYMERS, vol. 22, page 547 | - R. LANGER ET AL., CHEM. TECH., (1982), vol. 12, page 98 | - FLETCHER, F.A. ET AL., J. EXPER. MED., (1991), vol. 174, pages 837 - 845 | - MÄKELÄ, T.P. ET AL., GENE, (1992), vol. 118, pages 293 - 294 | - PORGADOR, A. ET AL., CANC. RES., (1992), vol. 52, pages 3679 - 3686 | - YOSHIMURA, K. ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1992), vol. 20, pages 3233 - 3240 | - LIM, B. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. (U.S.A., (1989), vol. 86, pages 8892 - 8896 | - OHI, S. ET AL., GENE, (1990), vol. 89, pages 279 - 282 | - RUSSEL, S.J. ET AL., J. VIROL., (1992), vol. 66, pages 2821 - 2828 | - GARGER, S.J. ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1983), vol. 117, pages 835 - 842 | - CHOMCZYNSKI, P.; SACCHI, N., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1987), vol. 162, pages 1.56 - 159 | - LUMPKIN, C.K. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1986), vol. 232, pages 393 - 395 | - PEREIRA-SMITH, O.M. ET AL., EXP. CELL RES., (1985), vol. 160, pages 297 - 306 | - STEIN, G.H.; ATKINS, L., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA., (1986), vol. 83, pages 9030 - 9034 |