EP0724502 - ABRASIVE ARTICLES COMPRISING A MAKE COAT TRANSFERRED BY LAMINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/32] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOLLETT, Gary, J. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
SCHNABEL, Herbert, W. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
MASMAR, Craig A. 12367 - 24th Street North Lake Emo, Minnesota 55042 / US | 04 /
PETERSON, Jeffrey S. 590 McCutcheon Road Hudson, WI 54016 / US | [1998/12] |
Former [1997/44] | 01 /
FOLLETT, Gary, J. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
02 /
SCHNABEL, Herbert, W. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | |||
03 /
MASMAR, Craig A. 12367 - 24th Street North Stillwater, MN 55082 / US | |||
04 /
PETERSON, Jeffrey S. 590 McCutcheon Road Hudson, WI 54016 / US | |||
Former [1996/32] | 01 /
FOLLETT, Gary, J. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
02 /
SCHNABEL, Herbert, W. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/32] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94927343.7 | 06.09.1994 | [1996/32] | WO1994US09990 | Priority number, date | US19930138766 | 19.10.1993 Original published format: US 138766 | US19930166550 | 14.12.1993 Original published format: US 166550 | [1996/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9511111 | Date: | 27.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0724502 | Date: | 07.08.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0724502 | Date: | 11.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B24D3/28, B24D11/02 | [1996/32] | CPC: |
B24D11/02 (EP,US);
B24D3/28 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, IT, LI, SE [1996/32] | Title | German: | SCHLEIFMITTEL MIT EINER DURCH ÜBERTRAGUNG LAMINIERTEN GRUNDSCHICHT | [1996/32] | English: | ABRASIVE ARTICLES COMPRISING A MAKE COAT TRANSFERRED BY LAMINATION | [1996/32] | French: | ARTICLES ABRASIFS COMPRENANT UNE COUCHE D'EGALISATION TRANSFEREE PAR STRATIFICATION | [1996/32] | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.1996 | National basic fee paid | 14.05.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/32] | 26.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.10.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 11.04.2001 | LI | 11.04.2001 | SE | 11.07.2001 | ES | 30.10.2001 | [2004/04] |
Former [2002/15] | CH | 11.04.2001 | |
LI | 11.04.2001 | ||
SE | 11.07.2001 | ||
Former [2002/05] | SE | 11.07.2001 | Cited in | International search | [PX]EP0587171 (NORTON CO [US]) [PX] 1-5,10-12,14,17,21-24 * page 1, line 11 - line 17 * * page 2, line 32 - page 3, line 25 * * see specially page 3, lines 28-55 * * page 4, line 12 - line 49 * * claims 1,8 *; | [ED]EP0620083 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [ED] 1-5,7-17,19-24 * page 1, line 9 - line 15 * * page 3, line 14 - page 4, line 17 * * page 9, line 24 - line 50 * * page 10, line 25 - page 11, line 41 * * claims 1,3,4,10-12 *; | [A]EP0237784 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [A] 1-5,12,14,16,17 * page 10, line 24 - line 37 * * page 15, line 26 - line 37 * * figures 1-8; claims 1,4,18,20,21 *; | [A]EP0465351 (CECA SA [FR]) [A] 1-4,7,14,18,22,23 * page 4, line 12 - line 51 * * claims 5-8 *; | [A]JPH048783 ; | [PA]JPH0623675 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 92, no. 08, Database accession no. 92-061856 C08!, & JPH048783 A 19920113 (SEIKO DENSHI BUHIN) [A] 1-5,14,23 * abstract * | [PA] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 94, no. 10, Database accession no. 94-077357 C10!, & JPH0623675 A 19940201 (NIKON CORP. AND TAIYO KAGAKU SANGYO K.K.) [PA] 1,2,14,15,23 * abstract * |