EP0720772 - POWER SWITCH WITH AN ARC QUENCHING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.1998 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.03.1998 [1998/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/28] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANTHE, Karl-Heinz Kattfussstrasse 11 D-13593 Berlin / DE | 02 /
SEIDLER-STAHL, Günter Sternstrasse 11 D-13359 Berlin / DE | [1996/28] | Application number, filing date | 94927482.3 | 16.09.1994 | [1996/28] | WO1994DE01110 | Priority number, date | DE19934333278 | 24.09.1993 Original published format: DE 4333278 | [1996/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9508832 | Date: | 30.03.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0720772 | Date: | 10.07.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.03.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0720772 | Date: | 02.04.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H01H9/34 | [1996/28] | CPC: |
H01H9/342 (EP,US);
H01H9/34 (EP,US);
H01H2009/305 (EP,US);
H01H2009/348 (EP,US);
H01H2077/025 (EP,US);
H01H71/1009 (EP,US);
H01H83/20 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1996/28] | Title | German: | LEISTUNGSSCHALTER MIT EINER LICHTBOGENLÖSCHEINRICHTUNG | [1996/28] | English: | POWER SWITCH WITH AN ARC QUENCHING DEVICE | [1996/28] | French: | SECTIONNEUR DE PUISSANCE POURVU D'UN SYSTEME D'EXTINCTION D'ARC ELECTRIQUE | [1996/28] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.1996 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/28] | 30.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2293452 (BOEHNE EUGENE W) [Y] 7 * page 4, column L, line 32 - line 68 *; | [Y]DE1021054 (SIEMENS AG) [Y] 3,4 * column 3, line 63 - column 4, line 5 *; | [XY]FR1194613 (STOTZ KONTAKT GMBH) [X] 1,2,6,8,9 * page 1, column R, paragraph 2 * [Y] 3,4,7; | [A]DE1185269 (LICENTIA GMBH) [A] 1 * column 4, line 38 - column 5, line 6 *; | [A]EP0183114 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [DE]) [A] 1* abstract * |