EP0721578 - CARTRIDGE FOR TREATING SAMPLES FOR HISTOLOGICAL EXAMINATION, IN PARTICULAR FOR PREPARING SLICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.1998 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.03.1998 [1998/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leica Instruments GmbH Postfach 11 20 D-69222 Nussloch / DE | [1996/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRAUPNER, Dag Franz-Holzmann-Strasse 27 D-69214 Eppelheim / DE | [1996/29] | Representative(s) | Stamer, Harald c/o Leica Industrieverwaltung GmbH Konzernstelle Patente + Marken Postfach 20 20 35530 Wetzlar / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/29] | Stamer, Harald, Dipl.-Phys. c/o Leica Industrieverwaltung GmbH, Konzernstelle Patente + Marken, Postfach 20 20 D-35530 Wetzlar / DE | Application number, filing date | 94927492.2 | 28.09.1994 | [1996/29] | WO1994DE01123 | Priority number, date | DE19934333118 | 29.09.1993 Original published format: DE 4333118 | [1996/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9509352 | Date: | 06.04.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0721578 | Date: | 17.07.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0721578 | Date: | 26.03.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/36 | [1996/29] | CPC: |
G01N1/36 (EP,US);
G01N2001/315 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1996/29] | Title | German: | KASSETTE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON PROBEN FÜR HISTOLOGISCHE UNTERSUCHUNGEN, INSBESONDERE ZUR SCHNITTPRÄPARATION | [1996/29] | English: | CARTRIDGE FOR TREATING SAMPLES FOR HISTOLOGICAL EXAMINATION, IN PARTICULAR FOR PREPARING SLICES | [1996/29] | French: | CASSETTE DE TRAITEMENT D'ECHANTILLONS EN VUE D'EXAMENS HISTOLOGIQUES, NOTAMMENT DE PREPARATION DE COUPES | [1996/29] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.1996 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/29] | 04.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DXY]EP0471534 (MCCORMICK JAMES B [US]) [DX] 1-4 * column 6, line 10 - column 7, line 19; figures 1-3,10-12 * [Y] 6; | [Y]US5127537 (GRAHAM DONALD R [US]) [Y] 6 * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 33; figures 1,2 *; | [DA]US4421246 (SCHULTZ RONALD W [US], et al) [DA] 1,2,6 * column A; figure - * |