EP0671089 - METHOD FOR DIGITAL HALF-DUPLEX TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/37] | METHOD FOR DIGITAL SEMI-DUPLEX TRANSMISSION | ||
[1999/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2000 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Networks Oy Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [1999/49] |
Former [1997/40] | For all designated states NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [1995/37] | For all designated states NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY Mäkkylän Puistotie 1 FIN-02600 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÄKELÄINEN, Kimmo Fleminginkatu 12 A 18 FIN-00530 Helsinki / FI | 02 /
LEHMUSTO, Mika Metsärinne 7 C FIN-04220 Kerava / FI | 03 /
HEISKARI, Mika Riistapolku 4 B 30 FIN-02120 Espoo / FI | [1995/37] | Representative(s) | Tomlinson, Kerry John, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/37] | Tomlinson, Kerry John, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. European Patent Attorneys Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 94927678.6 | 26.09.1994 | [1995/37] | WO1994FI00431 | Priority number, date | FI19930004229 | 27.09.1993 Original published format: FI 934229 | [1995/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9509497 | Date: | 06.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0671089 | Date: | 13.09.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0671089 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 06.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/16, H04J3/06, H04J3/12 | [1999/13] | CPC: |
H04J3/12 (EP,US);
H04J3/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/37] | H04L5/16, H04Q7/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DIGITALEN HALBDUPLEXÜBERTRAGUNG | [1995/37] | English: | METHOD FOR DIGITAL HALF-DUPLEX TRANSMISSION | [1999/13] | French: | PROCEDE POUR LA TRANSMISSION NUMERIQUE EN SEMI-DUPLEX | [1995/37] |
Former [1995/37] | METHOD FOR DIGITAL SEMI-DUPLEX TRANSMISSION | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.1995 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.1995 | Examination requested [1995/48] | 29.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.01.2000 | BE | 05.01.2000 | CH | 05.01.2000 | ES | 05.01.2000 | FR | 05.01.2000 | GR | 05.01.2000 | IT | 05.01.2000 | LI | 05.01.2000 | SE | 05.01.2000 | DK | 05.04.2000 | PT | 05.04.2000 | IE | 26.09.2000 | LU | 26.09.2000 | MC | 30.09.2000 | [2008/05] |
Former [2007/29] | AT | 05.01.2000 | |
BE | 05.01.2000 | ||
CH | 05.01.2000 | ||
ES | 05.01.2000 | ||
FR | 05.01.2000 | ||
GR | 05.01.2000 | ||
LI | 05.01.2000 | ||
SE | 05.01.2000 | ||
DK | 05.04.2000 | ||
PT | 05.04.2000 | ||
IE | 26.09.2000 | ||
LU | 26.09.2000 | ||
MC | 30.09.2000 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 05.01.2000 | |
BE | 05.01.2000 | ||
CH | 05.01.2000 | ||
ES | 05.01.2000 | ||
FR | 05.01.2000 | ||
GR | 05.01.2000 | ||
LI | 05.01.2000 | ||
SE | 05.01.2000 | ||
DK | 05.04.2000 | ||
PT | 05.04.2000 | ||
IE | 26.09.2000 | ||
MC | 30.09.2000 | ||
Former [2004/07] | AT | 05.01.2000 | |
BE | 05.01.2000 | ||
CH | 05.01.2000 | ||
ES | 05.01.2000 | ||
GR | 05.01.2000 | ||
LI | 05.01.2000 | ||
SE | 05.01.2000 | ||
DK | 05.04.2000 | ||
PT | 05.04.2000 | ||
FR | 02.06.2000 | ||
IE | 26.09.2000 | ||
MC | 30.09.2000 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 05.01.2000 | |
BE | 05.01.2000 | ||
CH | 05.01.2000 | ||
ES | 05.01.2000 | ||
LI | 05.01.2000 | ||
SE | 05.01.2000 | ||
DK | 05.04.2000 | ||
PT | 05.04.2000 | ||
FR | 02.06.2000 | ||
IE | 26.09.2000 | ||
MC | 30.09.2000 | ||
Former [2002/42] | AT | 05.01.2000 | |
BE | 05.01.2000 | ||
CH | 05.01.2000 | ||
ES | 05.01.2000 | ||
LI | 05.01.2000 | ||
SE | 05.01.2000 | ||
PT | 05.04.2000 | ||
FR | 02.06.2000 | ||
IE | 26.09.2000 | ||
MC | 30.09.2000 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 05.01.2000 | |
BE | 05.01.2000 | ||
CH | 05.01.2000 | ||
ES | 05.01.2000 | ||
LI | 05.01.2000 | ||
SE | 05.01.2000 | ||
PT | 05.04.2000 | ||
FR | 02.06.2000 | ||
IE | 26.09.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 05.01.2000 | |
BE | 05.01.2000 | ||
CH | 05.01.2000 | ||
LI | 05.01.2000 | ||
SE | 05.01.2000 | ||
PT | 05.04.2000 | ||
FR | 02.06.2000 | ||
IE | 26.09.2000 | ||
Former [2001/50] | AT | 05.01.2000 | |
BE | 05.01.2000 | ||
CH | 05.01.2000 | ||
LI | 05.01.2000 | ||
PT | 05.04.2000 | ||
FR | 02.06.2000 | ||
IE | 26.09.2000 | ||
Former [2001/09] | AT | 05.01.2000 | |
BE | 05.01.2000 | ||
CH | 05.01.2000 | ||
LI | 05.01.2000 | ||
PT | 05.04.2000 | ||
FR | 02.06.2000 | ||
Former [2001/08] | AT | 05.01.2000 | |
BE | 05.01.2000 | ||
CH | 05.01.2000 | ||
LI | 05.01.2000 | ||
Former [2000/52] | CH | 05.01.2000 | |
LI | 05.01.2000 | ||
Former [2000/50] | CH | 10.04.2000 | |
LI | 10.04.2000 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5025442 (LYNK CHARLES N [US], et al); | [A]WO9109481 (MOTOROLA INC [US]); | [A]US5249304 (MULFORD KEITH I [US]) |