EP0722234 - SELECTIVE DIVERSITY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2002 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/23] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | ||
Former [1996/29] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASUDA, Atsushi 35-16-1-201, Susukino-machi, Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa 229 / JP | [1996/29] | Representative(s) | Waldren, Robin Michael Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/29] | Waldren, Robin Michael MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 94927792.5 | 28.09.1994 | [1996/29] | WO1994JP01599 | Priority number, date | JP19930241566 | 28.09.1993 Original published format: JP 24156693 | [1996/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9509495 | Date: | 06.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0722234 | Date: | 17.07.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0722234 | Date: | 06.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.04.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/06, H04B7/08, H04J3/00 | [1996/29] | CPC: |
H04B7/082 (EP,US);
H04L1/06 (EP,US);
H04W24/00 (EP,US);
H04W84/022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1996/29] | Title | German: | SELEKTIVE DIVERSITY-ANORDNUNG | [1996/29] | English: | SELECTIVE DIVERSITY SYSTEM | [1996/29] | French: | SYSTEME SELECTIF EN DIVERSITE | [1996/29] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.1996 | Translation filed | 24.04.1996 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.1996 | Search fee paid | 24.04.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 24.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/30] | 31.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 06.06.2001 | SE | 06.09.2001 | [2003/08] |
Former [2002/05] | SE | 06.09.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4513412 (COX DONALD C [US]) [X] 1-4 * column 3, lines 5-57; figures 1,9,10 * * column 4, line 44 - column 5, line 20; claim 8 *[A] 5-10; | [XA]EP0364190 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [X] 1-4 * column 5, line 3 - line 20; figures 2-4 * * column 8, line 56 - column 9, line 31 * [A] 5-10 | International search | [Y]JPH0265420 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [XAY]JPH0348533 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [E]JPH06204925 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) | [Y] - YOSHIHIKO AKAI, "Antenna Selecting Diversity System for Digital Mobile Communication", 1989 IEICE SPRING NATIONAL CONFERENCE LECTURE THESES, Vol. 2, page 360, March 1989. |