EP0740511 - COMPRESSION BRASSIERE WITH PAD FOR MANUAL LYMPHATIC DRAINAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/45] | COMPRESSION BRASSIERE AND PAD FOR MANUAL LYMPHATIC DRAINAGE | ||
[1998/34] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.07.2000 [2000/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Barbé-Vicuna, Lucrecia Schout de Wallestraat 19 NL-5062 AT Oisterwijk / NL | [1996/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barbé-Vicuna, Lucrecia Schout de Wallestraat 19 5062 AT Oisterwijk / NL | 02 /
Hamers, Han Peter Tuldensedijk 3a 5085 NB Esbeek / NL | [1996/45] | Representative(s) | de Bruijn, Leendert C., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1996/45] | de Bruijn, Leendert C., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 94927866.7 | 18.08.1994 | [1996/45] | WO1994NL00195 | Priority number, date | NL19930001432 | 18.08.1993 Original published format: NL 9301432 | [1996/45] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9505095 | Date: | 23.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0740511 | Date: | 06.11.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0740511 | Date: | 28.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A41C3/10, A41C3/14 | [1996/45] | CPC: |
A41C3/0064 (EP,US);
A41C3/0092 (EP,US);
A41C3/10 (EP,US);
A41C3/148 (EP,US);
A61F13/145 (EP,US);
A61F2/52 (EP,US);
A61F2013/15016 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1996/45] | Title | German: | KOMPRIMIERENDER BÜSTENHALTER MIT KISSEN FÜR MANUELLE LYMPHATISCHE DRAINAGE | [1998/34] | English: | COMPRESSION BRASSIERE WITH PAD FOR MANUAL LYMPHATIC DRAINAGE | [1998/34] | French: | SOUTIEN-GORGE A COMPRESSION AVEC COUSSIN AYANT UN EFFET DE DRAINAGE LYMPHATIQUE MANUEL | [1998/34] |
Former [1996/45] | KOMPRIMIERENTER BÜSTENHALTER UND KISSEN FÜR MANUELLEN LYMPHATISCHEN DRAINAGE | ||
Former [1996/45] | COMPRESSION BRASSIERE AND PAD FOR MANUAL LYMPHATIC DRAINAGE | ||
Former [1996/45] | SOUTIEN-GORGE A COMPRESSION, ET COUSSIN AYANT UN EFFET DE DRAINAGE LYMPHATIQUE MANUEL | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.1995 | Translation filed | 19.02.1996 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/45] | 05.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 08.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 22.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP99200022.4 / EP0922443 | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]FR958747 (A. LOCHER) [DX] 1,3-5,7 * the whole document *; | [X]US2641763 (SCHROEDER WILLIAM E) [X] 1,3-5,7 * the whole document *; | [X]DE8811089U (ANITA-SPEZIAL MIEDERFABRIK DR. HELBIG GMBH AND CO) [X] 1,3,4,7* page 2, line 7 - page 3, line 16; figures 1-3; claims 1,8,9 *; | [X]DE8903376U (ANITA SPEZIALMIEDERFABRIK DR. HELBIG GAS.M.B.H.) [X] 1,3,4,7 * page 3, line 17 - line 28; figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [X]DE9107681U (AMOENA-MEDIZIN-ORTHOPÄDIC-TECHNIQUE) [X] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 * |