EP0719146 - NOVEL METHOD OF PROGESTERONE DELIVERY AND EFFECT THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/27] | NOVEL METHOD OF PROGESTERONE DELIVERY AND AFFECT THEREOF | ||
[1998/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.10.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.12.1999 [1999/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Columbia Laboratories (Bermuda) Limited Rosebank Center, 14 Bermudiana Road Pembroke HM08 / BM | [N/P] |
Former [1998/26] | For all designated states Columbia Laboratories (Bermuda) Limited Rosebank Center, 14 Bermudiana Road Pembroke HM06 / BM | ||
Former [1996/27] | For all designated states COLUMBIA LABORATORIES, INC. Suite PH-II-B, 2665 South Bayshore Drive Coconut Grove, FL 33133 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOLOGNA, William, Joseph 501 East 79th Street New York, NY 10021 / US | 02 /
LEVINE, Howard, Leslie 15 Franklin Place Oceanside, NY 11572 / US | [1996/27] | Representative(s) | Goldin, Douglas Michael, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/27] | Goldin, Douglas Michael, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 94928089.5 | 13.09.1994 | [1996/27] | WO1994US10270 | Priority number, date | US19930122371 | 15.09.1993 Original published format: US 122371 | [1996/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9507699 | Date: | 23.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0719146 | Date: | 03.07.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0719146 | Date: | 23.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/57, A61K9/00, A61K47/32 | [1996/27] | CPC: |
A61K9/0034 (EP,US);
A61K31/57 (EP,US);
A61K47/32 (EP,US);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P5/24 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/57, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/57, A61K31/565 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/27] | Title | German: | NEUE VERFAHREN ZUR PROGESTERONABGABE | [1996/27] | English: | NOVEL METHOD OF PROGESTERONE DELIVERY AND EFFECT THEREOF | [1998/52] | French: | NOUVEAU PROCEDE D'ADMINISTRATION DE LA PROGESTERONE ET EFFETS INDUITS | [1996/27] |
Former [1996/27] | NOVEL METHOD OF PROGESTERONE DELIVERY AND AFFECT THEREOF | Entry into regional phase | 09.04.1996 | National basic fee paid | 09.04.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.04.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/27] | 02.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 22.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 24.06.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO8502092 (BIO MIMETICS INC [US]) [Y] 1-20 * claims 1,2 * * page 11, line 24 - page 12, line 26 * * page 16, line 24 - line 35 * * page 21, line 16 - line 19 *; | [Y]EP0151326 (MAUVAIS JARVIS PIERRE [FR], et al) [Y] 1-20 * claims 1-3 ** page 4, line 32 - page 5, line 22 * |