EP0720681 - INJECTION HOSE FOR CONCRETE CONSTRUCTION JOINTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK Updated state(s): FR | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BBZ INJEKTIONS- UND ABDICHTUNGSTECHNICH GMBH Hans-Böckler-Strasse 22 D-47877 Willich / DE | [1996/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOOB, Kunibert Bönninger Strasse 51 D-46519 Alpen / DE | [1996/28] | Representative(s) | Keil & Schaafhausen Patentanwälte PartGmbB Bockenheimer Landstraße 25 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/28] | KEIL & SCHAAFHAUSEN Patentanwälte Eysseneckstrasse 31 60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 94928797.3 | 22.09.1994 | [1996/28] | WO1994EP03174 | Priority number, date | DE19934332589 | 24.09.1993 Original published format: DE 4332589 | [1996/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9508680 | Date: | 30.03.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0720681 | Date: | 10.07.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.03.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0720681 | Date: | 17.12.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/68 | [1996/28] | CPC: |
E04B1/6816 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI [1996/28] | Title | German: | INJEKTIONSSCHLAUCH FÜR ARBEITSFUGEN AN BETONBAUWERKEN | [1996/28] | English: | INJECTION HOSE FOR CONCRETE CONSTRUCTION JOINTS | [1996/28] | French: | TUYAU FLEXIBLE D'INJECTION POUR JOINTS DE CONSTRUCTIONS EN BETON | [1996/28] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.1996 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/28] | 01.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.06.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.09.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 17.12.1997 | ES | 17.12.1997 | FR | 17.12.1997 | GB | 17.12.1997 | GR | 17.12.1997 | IT | 17.12.1997 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/26] | ES | 17.12.1997 | |
GB | 17.12.1997 | ||
GR | 17.12.1997 | ||
IT | 17.12.1997 | ||
FR | 15.05.1998 | ||
Former [2000/05] | GB | 17.12.1997 | |
GR | 17.12.1997 | ||
IT | 17.12.1997 | ||
FR | 15.05.1998 | ||
Former [1999/42] | GB | 17.12.1997 | |
IT | 17.12.1997 | ||
FR | 15.05.1998 | ||
Former [1998/44] | GB | 17.12.1997 | |
FR | 15.05.1998 | ||
Former [1998/41] | GB | 17.12.1997 | Cited in | International search | [DA]DE8425518U (KOOB); | [DA]DE3512470 (KOOB KUNIBERT ING GRAD) [DA] 1 * page 5, line 16 - page 6, line 9 * * page 7, line 26 - page 9, line 16; figure . * |