EP0722327 - IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO ANTIBACTERIAL COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2001 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | For:CH
DE
ES
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/47] | For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:CH
DE
ES
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | |||
Former [1996/30] | For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:CH
DE
ES
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BHAKOO, Manmohan 1 Borrowdale Road Bebington Wirral Merseyside L63 3AP / GB | [1996/30] | Representative(s) | Elliott, Peter William, et al Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/17] | Elliott, Peter William, et al Unilever plc Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [1999/14] | Dekker, Enno E.J., et al Unilever N.V. Patents Division P.O. Box 137 3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | ||
Former [1996/30] | Elliott, Peter William, et al Unilever plc Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 94928834.4 | 28.09.1994 | [1996/30] | WO1994EP03234 | Priority number, date | GB19930020443 | 05.10.1993 Original published format: GB 9320443 | GB19930025839 | 17.12.1993 Original published format: GB 9325839 | [1996/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9509638 | Date: | 13.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0722327 | Date: | 24.07.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0722327 | Date: | 22.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/785, C08G69/10 | [1996/30] | CPC: |
A61Q11/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/785 (EP,US);
A61K8/88 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
C08G69/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1996/30] | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNGEN VON ANTIBAKTERISCHEN ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [1996/30] | English: | IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO ANTIBACTERIAL COMPOSITIONS | [1996/30] | French: | AMELIORATIONS SE RAPPORTANT A DES COMPOSITIONS ANTIBACTERIENNES | [1996/30] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.1996 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.04.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/44] | 23.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.04.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.08.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 04.07.1996 | M01   Fee paid on   17.07.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 22.11.2000 | LI | 22.11.2000 | NL | 22.11.2000 | SE | 22.02.2001 | [2003/08] |
Former [2002/10] | CH | 22.11.2000 | |
LI | 22.11.2000 | ||
SE | 22.02.2001 | ||
Former [2001/51] | SE | 22.02.2001 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2622195 (MTA KUTATAS ES SZERVEZETELEMZO [HU], et al) [A] 1-13* the whole document * | [X] - E KATCHALSKI ET AL., "Antibiotically aczive amino-acid copolymers related to gramicidin S", NATURE., LONDON GB, (19550716), vol. 176, no. 4472, pages 118 - 119 [X] 1-13 * table 1 * | [A] - E SANTUCCI ET AL., "N-Aminoalkylpolyglycine. Synthesis, antibacterial activity and electrochemical behaviour as a titrant of living cells", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY., WASHINGTON US, (197009), vol. 13, no. 5, pages 846 - 848 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | [X] - S SHIMA ET AL., "Antimicrobial action of epsilon-poly-L-lysine", JOURNAL OF ANTIBIOTICS., TOKYO JP, (198411), vol. 37, no. 11, pages 1449 - 1455 [X] 1-13 * the whole document * |