EP0726314 - FIMBRILLIN PROTEIN OF $i(PORPHYROMONAS GINGIVALIS) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.04.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.1998 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.06.1998 [1998/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lion Corporation 3-7, Honjo 1-chome, Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-0004 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/33] | For all designated states LION CORPORATION 3-7, Honjo 1-chome Sumida-ku, Tokyo 130 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORISHIMA, Seiji 6-42-305, Hama-cho 1-chome Odawara-shi Kanagawa 250 / JP | [1996/33] | Representative(s) | Adams, William Gordon, et al RAWORTH, MOSS & COOK 36 Sydenham Road Croydon Surrey CR0 2EF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/33] | Adams, William Gordon, et al RAWORTH, MOSS & COOK 36 Sydenham Road Croydon Surrey CR0 2EF / GB | Application number, filing date | 94929022.5 | 07.10.1994 | [1996/33] | WO1994JP01687 | Priority number, date | JP19930253203 | 08.10.1993 Original published format: JP 25320393 | [1996/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9510612 | Date: | 20.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0726314 | Date: | 14.08.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.04.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/31, C07K14/195, C07K16/12, A61K38/16, A61K39/395 | [1998/15] | CPC: |
C07K16/1203 (EP);
C07K14/195 (EP);
C07K16/1257 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1996/33] | C12N15/31, C12P21/02, C12N1/21, C07K14/195, C07K16/12, A61K38/16, A61K39/395 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1996/33] | Title | German: | FIMBRILLINPROTEIN AUS $i(PORPHYROMONAS GINGIVALIS) | [1996/33] | English: | FIMBRILLIN PROTEIN OF $i(PORPHYROMONAS GINGIVALIS) | [1996/33] | French: | PROTEINE FIMBRILLINE DE $i(PORPHYROMONAS GINGIVALIS) | [1996/33] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.1996 | Translation filed | 29.04.1996 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.1996 | Search fee paid | 29.04.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 29.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/33] | 04.04.1998 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1998/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP0726276 (MEITO SANGYO KK ;KYOWA MEDEX CO LTD (JP); KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK (JP) [E] 9-13,16,17,20-22 * column W *; | [X] - ZHANG Y.J., "Heterogeneity of Porphyromonas gingivalis strains on fimbrillin gene locus by restriction fragment length polymorphism analysis.", BULLETIN OF TOKYO MEDICAL AND DENTAL UNIVERSITY, (199309), vol. 40, no. 3, pages 113 - 123, XP002055807 [X] 1-8,14,15,21 * column W * | [XY] - EVANS R.T. ET AL., "Immunization with fimbrial protein and peptide protects against Porphyromonas gingivalis-induced periodontal tissue destruction.", ADVANCES IN EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY, (1992), vol. 327, pages 255 - 262, XP002055808 [X] 8-11,16,18,19,21,22 * column W * [Y] 20 | [XY] - OGAWA T. ET AL., "Immunobiological activities of synthetic peptide segments of fimbrial protein from Porphyromonas gingivalis.", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (1991), vol. 180, no. 3, pages 1335 - 1341, XP002055809 [X] 9-13,16,17 [Y] 20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0006-291X(05)81342-7 | [PX] - FUJIWARA T. ET AL., "Molecular cloning and sequencing of the fimbrilin gene of Porphyromonas gingivalis strains and characterization of recombinant proteins.", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (19931130), vol. 197, no. 1, pages 241 - 247, XP002055810 [PX] 1-17 * column W * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.1993.2467 | International search | [Y]JPH02135096 ; | [X]JPH0526471B | [XY] - JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, Vol. 170, No. 4, p. 1658-1665, DICKINSON, DOUGLAS P. et al., "Molecular Cloning and Sequencing of the Gene Encoding the Fimbrial Subunit Protein of Bacteroides Gingivalis". |