EP0685008 - PAPER-MACHINE FELT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.05.1999 [1999/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EMS-Inventa AG Selnaustrasse 16 8001 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1998/21] | For all designated states EMS-INVENTA AG Selnaustrasse 16 8001 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [1995/49] | For all designated states EMS-INVENTA AG Selnaustrasse 16 CH-8001 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHUETZE, Gustav Via Caguils 16B CH-7013 Domat/Ems / CH | 02 /
SPINDLER, Jürgen Wulftieni 16 CH-7013 Domat/Ems / CH | [1995/49] | Representative(s) | Becker, Eberhard Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/13] | Becker, Eberhard Patentanwälte, Kirschner & Kurig, Sollner Strasse 38 81479 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/03] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/49] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 D-81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94929527.3 | 10.10.1994 | [1995/49] | WO1994EP03337 | Priority number, date | DE19934343067 | 16.12.1993 Original published format: DE 4343067 | DE19944434898 | 29.09.1994 Original published format: DE 4434898 | [1995/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9516810 | Date: | 22.06.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0685008 | Date: | 06.12.1995 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0685008 | Date: | 20.05.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | D04H1/42, D04H13/00 | [1995/49] | CPC: |
D04H1/4334 (EP,US);
D04H1/498 (EP,US);
D04H1/60 (EP,US);
D04H1/645 (EP,US);
D04H13/00 (EP,US);
D21F7/083 (EP,US);
Y10S162/90 (EP,US);
Y10S162/902 (EP,US);
Y10T442/197 (EP,US);
Y10T442/198 (EP,US);
Y10T442/3098 (EP,US);
Y10T442/3146 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, LI, SE [1995/49] | Title | German: | PAPIERMASCHINENFILZ | [1995/49] | English: | PAPER-MACHINE FELT | [1995/49] | French: | FEUTRE POUR MACHINE A PAPIER | [1995/49] | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.1995 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.1995 | Examination requested [1995/49] | 10.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0287297 (ALBANY RESEARCH UK [GB]) [A] 1-4* page 2, line 28 - page 4, line 24 *; | [DA]EP0474027 (INVENTA AG [CH]) [DA] 1-3,6-12 * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 29; examples 1-20 *; | [A]EP0529506 (INVENTA AG [CH]) [A] 1,4,5 * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 46 * |