EP0725677 - COLORANT COMPOSITIONS AND PROCESSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.04.2000 [2000/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [1996/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUMAR, Kanta P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
DAVIS, Robert, A. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
NICHOLS, Sheila, M. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
BUTTERY, Howard, J. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [1996/33] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/33] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94930038.8 | 04.10.1994 | [1996/33] | WO1994US11267 | Priority number, date | US19930145492 | 29.10.1993 Original published format: US 145492 | [1996/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9511747 | Date: | 04.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0725677 | Date: | 14.08.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0725677 | Date: | 21.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B01J13/02, C08J3/21 | [1996/33] | CPC: |
C08J3/12 (EP,US);
C09B67/0061 (EP,US);
C09B67/0097 (EP,US);
C09D7/41 (EP,US);
C08J2361/20 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2982 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/33] | Title | German: | FARBPRAEPARATE SOWIE VERFAHREN | [1998/21] | English: | COLORANT COMPOSITIONS AND PROCESSES | [1996/33] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE COLORANTS ET LEURS PROCEDES DE PRODUCTION | [1996/33] |
Former [1996/33] | FARBPREPARATE SOWIE VERFAHREN | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.1996 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/33] | 07.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 17.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 09.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 21.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3516846 (MATSON GALE W) [A] * column 18, line 15 - column 19, line 38; claims 1-7 *; | [A]EP0539142 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] * page 11 - page 12; examples 9-10; claims 1-23 *; | [A]WO9218601 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US], et al) [A] * page 28 - page 29; example 1 * * page 38 - page 39; example 12 * * claims 1-33 * |