EP0724500 - IMPROVEMENTS IN AND RELATING TO GRINDING MACHINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2001 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.09.2001 [2001/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unova U.K. Limited 26, Temple Street Aylesbury Buckinghamshire HP20 2RQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/38] | For all designated states Unova U.K. Limited 26, Temple Street Aylesbury, Buckinghamshire HP20 2RQ / GB | ||
Former [1996/32] | For all designated states WESTERN ATLAS U.K. LIMITED 26, Temple Street Aylesbury, Buckinghamshire HP20 2RQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAYCOCK, Michael 9 Newlands Drive Cross Hills Keighley West Yorkshire BD20 7DH / GB | [1996/32] | Representative(s) | Nash, Keith Wilfrid Nash Matthews 90-92 Regent Street Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/32] | Nash, Keith Wilfrid KEITH W. NASH & Co. Pearl Assurance House 90-92 Regent Street Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB | Application number, filing date | 94930282.2 | 20.10.1994 | [1996/32] | WO1994GB02302 | Priority number, date | GB19930021639 | 20.10.1993 Original published format: GB 9321639 | [1996/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9511110 | Date: | 27.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0724500 | Date: | 07.08.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0724500 | Date: | 11.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B24B19/12, B24B41/06 | [1996/32] | CPC: |
B24B19/12 (EP);
B24B41/065 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [1996/32] | Title | German: | SCHLEIFMASCHINE | [1996/32] | English: | IMPROVEMENTS IN AND RELATING TO GRINDING MACHINES | [1996/32] | French: | MACHINES A RECTIFIER AMELIOREES | [1996/32] | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.1996 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/32] | 21.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 19.01.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 07.04.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]FR2614226 (LEOGRA MECCANICA) [X] 1,2 * page 4, line 1 - page 6, line 27; figure 1 * [Y] 3-10; | [Y]US2639559 (PRICE) [Y] 10 * column 2, line 18 - line 36; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0241070 (GIUSTINA INTERNAZIONALE) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5103596 (FUJII) [A] 1 * abstract * | [Y] - WEDENIWSKI, "CNC-Nockenformschleifen mit keramischen Schleifsheiben", WERKSTATT UND BETRIEB, MUNCHEN DE, (198908), vol. 122, no. 8, pages 635 - 640 [Y] 3-10 * page 637; figures 4-6 * | Examination | JPH0531667 |