EP0672333 - COMPLIANT STACKING CONNECTOR FOR PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.12.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.02.2003 [2003/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bourns, Inc. 1200 Columbia Avenue Riverside, CA 92507 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/38] | For all designated states Bourns, Inc. 1200 Columbia Avenue Riverside, California 92507 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YUMIBE, George 16332 Del Mar Lane Huntington Beach, CA 92649 / US | 02 /
GRATZINGER, Paul 29124 Maltby Avenue Moreno Valley, CA 92360 / US | 03 /
NGUYEN, Thanh 30 Mill Valley Road Pomona, CA 91786 / US | 04 /
WISNER, Duane 610 Massachusetts Avenue Riverside, CA 92507 / US | [1995/38] | Representative(s) | Bertrand, Didier, et al Fédit-Loriot 38, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/38] | Bertrand, Didier, et al c/o S.A. FEDIT-LORIOT & AUTRES CONSEILS EN PROPRIETE INDUSTRIELLE 38, Avenue Hoche F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 94930462.0 | 21.09.1994 | [1995/38] | WO1994US10735 | Priority number, date | US19930131257 | 01.10.1993 Original published format: US 131257 | [1995/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9510170 | Date: | 13.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0672333 | Date: | 20.09.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.04.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H05K1/00, H01R23/72 | [1996/19] | CPC: |
H01R12/714 (EP,US);
H01R12/57 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/38] | H05K1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/38] | Title | German: | NACHGIEBIGES STAPELVERBINDUNGSTEIL FÜR LEITERPLATTEN | [1995/38] | English: | COMPLIANT STACKING CONNECTOR FOR PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARDS | [1995/38] | French: | CONNECTEUR D'EMPILAGE SOUPLE POUR PLAQUETTES DE CIRCUITS IMPRIMES | [1995/38] | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.1995 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.1995 | Search fee paid | 29.05.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/38] | 04.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/06] | 06.09.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2003/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4161346 (CHERIAN GABRIEL B [US], et al) [Y] 1 * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 5; figures 1-3 *; | [YA]US4891019 (OLSSON BILLY E [US]) [Y] 1 * column 3, line 4 - column 6, line 65; figures 1-6 * [A] 2-4,6,7,12,14,16-18; | [A]US5242314 (DI GIULIO PETER C [US], et al) [A] 1-4,14 * column 8, line 18 - column 9, line 30; figures 3-5,8,9 * | International search | [A]US4927369 (GRABBE DIMITRY G [US], et al); | [A]US4161346 (CHERIAN GABRIEL B [US], et al); | [A]US3715706 (COOK J, et al); | [A]US5199889 (MCDEVITT JR JOHN E [US]) |