EP0724441 - PICOSULPHATE DOSAGE FORM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.08.1998 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/32] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANDEL, Kenneth, Gary 5740 Auberger Drive Fairfield, OH 45014 / US | 02 /
DAVIS, Paula, Denise 105 E. Martin Luther King Drive 5 Cincinnati, OH 45219 / US | [1996/32] | Representative(s) | Brooks, Maxim Courtney, et al Proctor & Gamble (Health & Beauty Care) Limited Rusham Park Whitehall Lane, Egham Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Brooks, Maxim Courtney, et al Proctor & Gamble (Health & Beauty Care) Limited Rusham Park Whitehall Lane Egham Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | ||
Former [1996/32] | Brooks, Maxim Courtney, et al Rusham Park, Whitehall Lane Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | Application number, filing date | 94930520.5 | 29.09.1994 | [1996/32] | WO1994US11063 | Priority number, date | US19930139364 | 19.10.1993 Original published format: US 139364 | [1996/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9511024 | Date: | 27.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0724441 | Date: | 07.08.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/44, A61K9/00, A61K9/28, A61K9/48 | [1996/32] | CPC: |
A61K9/4891 (EP,US);
A61K31/44 (EP,US);
A61K31/4402 (EP,US);
A61K9/2846 (EP,US);
A61K9/4808 (EP,US);
A61P1/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1996/32] | Title | German: | NATRIUMPICOSULFAT ENTHALTENDE DOSIERUNGSFORM | [1996/32] | English: | PICOSULPHATE DOSAGE FORM | [1996/32] | French: | FORME GALENIQUE PICOSULFATE | [1996/32] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.1996 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/32] | 01.04.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/39] | 28.04.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1998/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1997 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | JPS649932 [ ] (TOYO CAPSEL KK); | JPH01258619 [ ] (TOYO CAPSEL KK); | [A]EP0341584 (TOKAI CAPSULE CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9 * claim - * * example - *; | [A]EP0343575 (STEPHAN GUENTER [DE]) [A] 1-9 * claim - ** example 2 *; | JPH02188524 [ ] (TAKADA SEIYAKU KK); | JPH0466531 [ ] (TAKADA SEIYAKU KK) | [DA] - DATABASE WPI, 2, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 89, no. 47, Database accession no. 89-345127 (47) [DA] 1-9 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 2, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 92, no. 15, Database accession no. 92-120851 (15) [A] 1-9 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 2, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 90, no. 35, Database accession no. 90-266188 (35) [A] 1-9 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 2, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 89, no. 08, Database accession no. 89-057693 (08) [A] 1-9 * abstract * |