EP0748344 - REACTIVE DILUENT ALDIMINE OXAZOLIDINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.11.1996 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.1996 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.01.1997 [1997/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ANGUS CHEMICAL COMPANY 1500 E. Lake Cook Road Buffalo Grove, IL 60089 / US | [1996/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOU, Chih-Yueh 1057 Judy Drive Elk Grove, IL 60007 / US | [1996/51] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/51] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94931423.1 | 21.10.1994 | [1996/51] | WO1994US12041 | Priority number, date | US19930143470 | 26.10.1993 Original published format: US 143470 | [1996/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9511933 | Date: | 04.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0748344 | Date: | 18.12.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.05.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/10, C08G18/32 | [1996/51] | CPC: |
C08G18/3296 (EP,US);
C08G18/10 (KR);
C07D263/04 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1996/51] | Title | German: | ALDIMINE-OXAZOLIDINEN ALS REAKTIVE VERDÜNNUNGSMITTEL | [1996/51] | English: | REACTIVE DILUENT ALDIMINE OXAZOLIDINES | [1996/51] | French: | ALDIMINE OXAZOLIDINES UTILISES COMME DILUANTS REACTIFS | [1996/51] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.1996 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.1996 | Search fee paid | 22.04.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/51] | 07.11.1996 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1997/02] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US4504647 (ZABEL LUTZ D [CH], et al); | [Y]US5214086 (MORMILE PATRICK J [US], et al); | [X]US4874805 (MUELHAUPT ROLF [CH], et al) |