EP0721001 - Two-pack aqueous adhesive cross-linked by amino siloxanes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.04.2000 [2000/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUNSTAR GIKEN KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-1 Aketa-cho Takatsuki-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/28] | For all designated states SUNSTAR GIKEN KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-1 Aketa-cho Takatsuki-shi Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ugai, Masaki 4-19-112 Mitejima, Nishiyodogawa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 02 /
Nakayama, Kiyoshi Mezon Ito No. 103, 308, Nishiarai, Tamaho-cho Nakakoma-gun, Yamanashi-ken / JP | 03 /
Mori, Masahito 4-5-3-510, Kamihamuro Takatsuki-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | [1996/28] | Representative(s) | Kraus, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/28] | Kraus, Walter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 D-80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95100084.3 | 04.01.1995 | [1996/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0721001 | Date: | 10.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0721001 | Date: | 14.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/54 | [1996/28] | CPC: |
C09J175/04 (EP);
C08G18/837 (EP);
C09J133/08 (EP);
C09J201/00 (EP);
C08G2170/80 (EP);
C08L2666/04 (EP);
C08L2666/44 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C09J133/08, C08L2666/44 (EP);
C09J175/04, C08L2666/04 (EP);
C09J201/00, C08L2666/44 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/28] | Title | German: | Wässriger Zweikomponentenkleber, der durch Aminosiloxane vernetzt wird | [1998/43] | English: | Two-pack aqueous adhesive cross-linked by amino siloxanes | [1996/28] | French: | Adhésif aqueux à deux emballages véhiculant par aminosiloxanes | [1996/28] |
Former [1996/28] | Wässriges Zweikomponentenkleber, der durch Aminosiloxane vernetzt wird | Examination procedure | 22.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/03] | 08.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.09.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0318192 (DOW CORNING) [A] 1-7 * page 5, line 41 - line 46 *; | [A]EP0544569 (RHONE-POULENC) [A] 1-7 * example 2 *; | [A]EP0215518 (DSM RESINS) [A] 1-7 * examples 1,II *; | [A]DE2432006 (DOW CORNING) [A] 1-7 * page 2, paragraph 3 *; | [A]DE4114923 (KANZAKI PAPER) [A] 1-7 * page 3, line 55 - page 4, line 3 * |