EP0702151 - Starter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.1999 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.12.1999 [1999/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho, Kariya-City Aichi-Pref. / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/33] | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-City, Aichi-Pref. / JP | ||
Former [1996/12] | For all designated states NIPPONDENSO CO., LTD. 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken 448 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shiga, Tsutomu 320 Kamiyama, Kouriki, Kouda-cho Nukata-gun, Aichi-pref. / JP | 02 /
Hayashi, Nobuyuki 13-22 Fujimi-cho, Naka-ku Nagoya-city, Aichi-pref. / JP | 03 /
Ohmi, Masanori 50 Agatagi, Anjo-cho Anjo-city, Aichi-pref. / JP | 04 /
Niimi, Masami 3-17 Touyou-cho Handa-city, Aichi-pref. / JP | [1996/12] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/12] | KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 D-85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 95100376.3 | 12.01.1995 | [1996/12] | Priority number, date | JP19940222322 | 19.09.1994 Original published format: JP 22232294 | [1996/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0702151 | Date: | 20.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0702151 | Date: | 16.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F02N15/06 | [1996/12] | CPC: |
F02N15/066 (EP,US);
F02N15/067 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/12] | Title | German: | Anlasser | [1996/12] | English: | Starter | [1996/12] | French: | Démarreur | [1996/12] | Examination procedure | 12.01.1995 | Examination requested [1996/12] | 14.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.06.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2552823 (PARIS & DU RHONE [FR]) [X] 1,4,5 * page 4, line 6 - page 5, line 4; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US3496759 (BUXTON JAMES E) [A] 2,3,7 * column 3, line 36 - line 47; figure - *; | [DA]GB390972 (SIMMS MOTOR UNITS LTD, et al) [DA] 2,7 * page 3, line 13 - line 25; figures 1,2 *; | [A]FR2625770 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 7 * abstract * |