EP0721810 - Straightening machine for rolled beams, in particular hyper-beams [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.1999 | Renewal fee | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMS SCHLOEMANN-SIEMAG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [1998/15] |
Former [1996/29] | For all designated states SMS SCHLOEMANN-SIEMAG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 D-40237 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Willems, Markus Carl-von-Ossietzky-Str. 13 D-40699 Erkrath / DE | [1996/29] | Representative(s) | Valentin, Ekkehard, et al Patentanwälte Hemmerich-Müller-Grosse- Pollmeier-Valentin-Gihske Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/29] | Valentin, Ekkehard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Hemmerich-Müller-Grosse- Pollmeier-Valentin-Gihske Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | Application number, filing date | 95100415.9 | 13.01.1995 | [1996/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0721810 | Date: | 17.07.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0721810 | Date: | 08.04.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B21B27/02, B21D3/05 | [1996/29] | CPC: |
B21D3/05 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, GB, IT [1996/29] | Title | German: | Richtmaschine für gewalzte Träger, insbesondere Hyper-Beams | [1996/29] | English: | Straightening machine for rolled beams, in particular hyper-beams | [1996/29] | French: | Machine pour le dressage des poutres laminées, en particulier des hyper-beams | [1996/29] | Examination procedure | 02.02.1995 | Examination requested [1996/29] | 27.06.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS60162505 ; | [DA]DE3522976 (SCHLOEMANN SIEMAG AG [DE]) [DA] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0443725 (SUMITOMO METAL IND [JP]) [A] 1 * figure 1; claims 1-4 *; | [A]US5152164 (HORIUCHI YASUSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1* figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0509136 (NIPPON KOKAN KK [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figure 1; claims 1-3 *; | [X]DE4232407 (HOESTEMBERGHE & KLUETSCH GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * figures 3,4; claims 1,2 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851225), vol. 9, no. 330, Database accession no. (M - 442), & JP60162505 A 19850824 (KAWASAKI SEITETSU) [X] 1,3 * abstract * |