EP0722706 - A roller therapeutic appliance and the method of fabricating it [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2003 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIHON KENKO ZOUSHIN KENKYUKAI CORPORATION 30-30, Najima 1-chome, Higashi-ku Fukuoka-shi Fukuoka 813 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/08] | For all designated states NIHON KENKO ZOUSHIN KENKYUKAI CORPORATION 30-30, Najima 1-chome, Higashi-ku Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 813 / JP | ||
Former [1996/30] | For all designated states NIHON KENKO ZOUSHIN KENKYUKAI CO. LTD. 30-30 Najima 1-chome, Higashi-ku Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 813 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Masuda, Isamu c/o Nihon Kenko Zoushin Kenkyukai Corp 30-30, Najima 1-chome Higashi-ku Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 813 / JP | [1996/30] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/30] | Dipl.-Phys.Dr. Manitz Dipl.-Ing. Finsterwald Dipl.-Ing. Grämkow Dipl.-Chem.Dr. Heyn Dipl.-Phys. Rotermund Morgan B.Sc.(Phys.) Robert-Koch-Strasse 1 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95100624.6 | 18.01.1995 | [1996/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0722706 | Date: | 24.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0722706 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61H15/00 | [1996/30] | CPC: |
A61H15/0092 (EP);
A61H2201/10 (EP);
A61N2/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, PT [1996/30] | Title | German: | Rollmassagegerät und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | [1996/30] | English: | A roller therapeutic appliance and the method of fabricating it | [1996/30] | French: | Rouleau de massage et son procédé de fabrication | [1996/30] | Examination procedure | 18.01.1995 | Examination requested [1996/30] | 03.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0116113 (NIHON KENKOZOSHIN KENKYUKAI KK ;TSUCHIYA RUBBER (JP)) [A] 1,7 * page 4, line 9 - line 19; figure - *; | [A]EP0436719 (NIHON KENKOZOSHIN KENKYUKAI KK) [A] 7 * column 3, line 5 - line 18; figure 2 *; | [A]EP0282173 (SATO ATUHIKO) [A] 1 * column 3, line 13 - line 28; figure - *; | [A]US4691693 (SATO RAY S) [A] 1 * column 2, line 44 - line 57; figure - * |