EP0664098 - Coffee machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.08.1998 [1998/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ESSEGIELLE S.r.l Strada San Mauro 25 I-10156 Torino / IT | [1995/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cortese, Virginio Via Rubens Fattorelli, 31 I-10100 Torino / IT | [1995/30] | Representative(s) | Jorio, Paolo, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1995/30] | Jorio, Paolo, et al Studio Torta, Via Viotti, 9 I-10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 95100631.1 | 18.01.1995 | [1995/30] | Priority number, date | IT1994TO00008U | 20.01.1994 Original published format: IT TO940008 U | [1995/30] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0664098 | Date: | 26.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0664098 | Date: | 27.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/06 | [1995/30] | CPC: |
A47J31/0657 (EP);
A47J31/4464 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, IT, LI, NL, PT [1995/30] | Title | German: | Kaffeemaschine | [1995/30] | English: | Coffee machine | [1995/30] | French: | Machine à café | [1995/30] | Examination procedure | 23.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/12] | 22.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.02.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE440854 (HENSCHEL & SOHN GMBH) [X] 1,6 * page 2, line 70 - page 3, line 63; figure - *; | [A]FR2269905 (PATZNER KG.) [A] 1,2 * page 2, line 8 - page 3, line 2; figure - * |