EP0685266 - Rotor for a laboratory centrifuge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.08.2000 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.09.2000 [2000/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIGMA LABORZENTRIFUGEN GmbH An der Unteren Söse 50 37520 Osterode / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/49] | For all designated states SIGMA LABORZENTRIFUGEN GmbH An der Unteren Söse 50 D-37520 Osterode / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Römer, Karl-Heinz Fuchshaller Weg 18 D-37520 Osterode / DE | [1995/49] | Representative(s) | Sobisch, Peter, et al Sobisch & Callies Benrather Strasse 21 42697 Solingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/49] | Sobisch, Peter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Inge. Röse, Kosel & Sobisch, Odastrasse 4a D-37581 Bad Gandersheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 95100796.2 | 21.01.1995 | [1995/49] | Priority number, date | DE19944419485 | 03.06.1994 Original published format: DE 4419485 | [1995/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0685266 | Date: | 06.12.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B04B13/00 | [1995/49] | CPC: |
B04B13/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1995/49] | Title | German: | Rotor für eine Laborzentrifuge | [1995/49] | English: | Rotor for a laboratory centrifuge | [1995/49] | French: | Rotor d'une centrifugeuse pour laboratoire | [1995/49] | Examination procedure | 06.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/01] | 15.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.12.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/39] | 08.05.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2000/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3982162 (D.W. OLLIFFE) [A] 1,8 * column A; claim 1 * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE3815449 (SIGMA LABORZENTRIFUGEN) [A] 1,8 * abstract *; | [A]DE3305461 (K. K. KUBOTA SEISAKUSHO) [A] 1,8 * page 10, line 10 - page 11, line 21; figures 6A,B * |