EP0671512 - Hydraulic locking device for quick couplings in construction machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2000 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.07.2000 [2000/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states O&K ORENSTEIN & KOPPEL AG Staakener Strasse 53-63 13581 Berlin / DE | [1999/32] |
Former [1995/37] | For all designated states O&K ORENSTEIN & KOPPEL AG Staakener Strasse 53-63 D-13581 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Teutsch, Ulrich Lupinenstr. 17 D-86179 Augsburg / DE | [1995/37] | Representative(s) | Meinke, Dabringhaus und Partner GbR Postfach 10 46 45 44046 Dortmund / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | Patentanwälte Meinke, Dabringhaus und Partner Westenhellweg 67 44137 Dortmund / DE | Application number, filing date | 95100825.9 | 23.01.1995 | [1995/37] | Priority number, date | DE19944408386 | 12.03.1994 Original published format: DE 4408386 | [1995/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0671512 | Date: | 13.09.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0671512 | Date: | 24.04.1996 | [1996/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0671512 | Date: | 11.08.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | E02F3/36, E02F9/22, F15B15/20 | [1996/17] | CPC: |
E02F3/3663 (EP);
E02F9/2267 (EP);
E02F9/2271 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1995/37] | E02F3/36, E02F9/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, IT, LI, NL [1995/37] | Title | German: | Hydraulisch betätigte Verriegelungsvorrichtung für Schnellwechsler an Bau- und Arbeitsmaschinen | [1995/37] | English: | Hydraulic locking device for quick couplings in construction machines | [1995/37] | French: | Dispositif hydraulique de blocage pour dispositifs d'attelage rapide d'engins de chantier | [1995/37] | Examination procedure | 06.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/27] | 24.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.02.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2304726 (LIEBHERR HYDRAULIKBAGGER [DE]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [Y]US4337687 (HOOVER ROBERT A) [Y] 1,2,7,8 * the whole document *; | [Y]US4872310 (KAYE ARTHUR [GB]) [Y] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE4102370 (FRITZEL WALTER [DE]) [Y] 1-3,7,8 * the whole document * |