EP0664076 - Boom mounted treatment apparatus, especially mowing apparatus with ground support-pressure controlling device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.12.1997 [1997/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MULAG- FAHRZEUGWERK H. WÖSSNER GMBH & CO. KG Postfach 11 40 D-7605 Bad Peterstal-Griesbach 1 / DE | [1995/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wössner, Werner Dipl.-Ing. Stöckmatt 11 D-77740 Bad Peterstal / DE | 02 /
Müller, Alfred Gewerbestrasse 8 D-77728 Oppenau-Löcherberg / DE | [1995/30] | Representative(s) | Hansmann, Axel, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hansmann, Vogeser, Dr. Boecker, Alber, Dr. Strych, Liedl Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/30] | Hansmann, Axel, Dipl.-Wirtsch.-Ing., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hansmann, Vogeser, Dr. Boecker, Alber, Dr. Strych, Liedl Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 D-81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95100868.9 | 23.01.1995 | [1995/30] | Priority number, date | DE19944401716 | 21.01.1994 Original published format: DE 4401716 | [1995/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0664076 | Date: | 26.07.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0664076 | Date: | 11.12.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A01D34/86 | [1995/30] | CPC: |
A01D34/86 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, LI [1995/30] | Title | German: | Ausleger-Arbeitsgerät, insbesondere Ausleger-Mähgerät mit reichweiten-unabhängiger Stelleinrichtung für den Auflagedruck auf dem bearbeiteten Gelände | [1995/30] | English: | Boom mounted treatment apparatus, especially mowing apparatus with ground support-pressure controlling device | [1995/30] | French: | Appareil de traitement en particulier de fauchage à bras porteur à dispositif d'asservissement de la pression d'appui au sol | [1995/30] | Examination procedure | 07.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/40] | 07.08.1995 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 07.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.1995 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 18.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/49] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1156452 (TURNER ENGINEERING COMPANY COU); | [A]DE3206757 (SCHLIESING HANS); | [A]GB2129265 (TURNER INT); | [A]GB2202122 (MCCONNEL F W LTD); | [A]FR2642797 (SECMAIR [FR]) [A] 1,3,5-8 * page 4, line 9 - page 8, line 4 *; | [A]WO9211750 (TURNER DEV LTD [GB]) [A] 1,4 * page 6, paragraph L - page 7, paragraph 2 * |