EP0664262 - Tiltable conveyor part for an article conveyor (sorter) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.1998 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.03.1998 [1998/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bernhard Beumer Maschinenfabrik KG Oelder Strasse 40 D-59269 Beckum / DE | [1995/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Droste, Heinrich, Dipl.-Ing. Elsässer Strasse 50 D-64832 Babenhausen / DE | 02 /
Pölling, Ludger, Dipl.-Ing. Soester Strasse 16 D-59329 Wadersloh / DE | [1995/30] | Representative(s) | Hoormann, Walter R., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/30] | Hoormann, Walter, Dr.-Ing., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95100986.9 | 25.01.1995 | [1995/30] | Priority number, date | DE19944401964 | 25.01.1994 Original published format: DE 4401964 | DE19944404084 | 09.02.1994 Original published format: DE 4404084 | [1995/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0664262 | Date: | 26.07.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0664262 | Date: | 19.03.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B65G47/00, B65G47/38 | [1995/30] | CPC: |
B65G47/962 (EP);
B65G47/965 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1995/30] | Title | German: | Kipp-Förderelement für einen Stückgutförderer (Sorter) | [1995/30] | English: | Tiltable conveyor part for an article conveyor (sorter) | [1995/30] | French: | Elément de transport basculant pour transporteur d'articles (trieuse) | [1995/30] | Examination procedure | 28.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/39] | 22.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.08.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2528403 (CANZIANI FRANCESCO [IT]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US3589501 (HARRISON JOHN) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]EP0341789 (SITMA [IT]) [A] 1 * column W * |