EP0666610 - Substrate integrated antenna [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.04.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.06.1999 [1999/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | [1995/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chatzipetros, Argyrios 12640 S.W. 2 Street Plantation, Florida 33325 / US | 02 /
Marko, Paul D. 1996 Denver Street Fort Lauderdale, Florida 33326 / US | 03 /
Krayeski, Paul 151 S.W. 91 Avenue Plantation, Florida 33324 / US | [1995/32] | Representative(s) | Hudson, Peter David, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint Alencon Link, Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/32] | Hudson, Peter David, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 95101034.7 | 26.01.1995 | [1995/32] | Priority number, date | US19940192529 | 07.02.1994 Original published format: US 192529 | [1995/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0666610 | Date: | 09.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/38, H01Q9/36, H01Q1/32 | [1995/32] | CPC: |
H01Q9/36 (EP,US);
H01Q1/246 (EP,US);
H01Q1/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1995/32] | Title | German: | Integrierte Antenne auf einem Substrat | [1995/32] | English: | Substrate integrated antenna | [1995/32] | French: | Antenne intégrée sur un substrat | [1995/32] | Examination procedure | 09.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/15] | 27.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/23] | 13.01.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1999 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2559623 (MALCOMBE JEAN CLAUDE [FR]) [A] 1,9,12 * figure 1; claims 1-7 *; | [A]EP0186455 (MARCONI CO LTD [GB]) [A] 1,12,14 * page 6 - page 8; figure 5 *; | [A] - GRIFFIN ET AL., "Electromagnetic Design Aspects Of Packages For Phased Array Modules That May Incorporate Monolithic Antenna Elements", IEEE ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION SOCIETY INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM 1993, ANN ARBOR,MICHIGAN,USA, (19930628), vol. 2, doi:doi:10.1109/APS.1993.385183, pages 986 - 989, XP010132574 [A] 1,12,14 * page 986 - page 988; figures 1,4,5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/APS.1993.385183 | [A] - PARFITT ET AL., "Mutual Coupling Between Metal Strip Antennas on Finite Size, Electrically Thick Dielectric Substrates", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION, NEW YORK US, vol. 41, no. 1, pages 108 - 115 [A] 1,12,14 * page 112, paragraph IV - page 113; figure 10 * | [A] - WEERAKODY, "DIVERSITY FOR THE DIRECT-SEQUENCE SPREAD SPECTRUM SYSTEM USING MULTIPLE TRANSMIT ANTENNAS", ICC 93 GENEVA IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS 93, GENEVA,SWITZERLAND, pages 1775 - 1779 [A] 1,12,14,15 * the whole document * | [A] - YAMADA ET AL., "Diversity Antennas for Base and Mobile Stations in Land Mobile Communication Systems", IEICE TRANSACTIONS, TOKYO JP, vol. E74, no. 10, pages 3202 - 3209, XP000279303 [A] 14,15 * page 3204 - page 3205; figures 6-9 * |