EP0667326 - Mixed refrigerant cycle for ethylene recovery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.07.1998 [1998/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC. 7201 Hamilton Boulevard Allentown, PA 18195-1501 / US | [1995/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Howard, Lee Jarvis 4211 Cottonwood Court Allentown, PA 18103 / US | 02 /
Rowles, Howard Charles 4529 Darby Street Center Valley, PA 18034 / US | [1995/33] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/33] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 D-81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95101154.3 | 27.01.1995 | [1995/33] | Priority number, date | US19940289872 | 12.08.1994 Original published format: US 289872 | US19940192024 | 04.02.1994 Original published format: US 192024 | [1995/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0667326 | Date: | 16.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0667326 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C07C11/04, C07C7/04 | [1995/33] | CPC: |
F25J3/0233 (EP);
C07C7/04 (EP);
F25J3/0219 (EP);
F25J3/0238 (EP);
F25J3/0252 (EP);
F25J2200/80 (EP);
F25J2210/12 (EP);
F25J2215/62 (EP);
F25J2270/12 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C07C7/04, C07C11/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/33] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Rückgewinnung von Ethylen mit gemischtem Kühlmittelumlauf | [1995/33] | English: | Mixed refrigerant cycle for ethylene recovery | [1995/33] | French: | Procédé de récupération d'éthylène à circuit de refroidissement mixte | [1995/33] | Examination procedure | 09.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/40] | 07.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4720293 (ROWLES HOWARD C [US], et al); | [PX]US5379597 | [PX] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 08, no. 95, Database accession no. 95-059822, & US5379597 A 19950110 (HOWARD L J ET AL) [PX] 1-14 * abstract * |