EP0667475 - Supporting collar for pipes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.04.2000 [2000/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zenhäusern, Heinrich Stephan Birmensdorferstrasse 134 CH-8902 Urdorf Z.H. / CH | [1995/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scotti, Emilio Vicolo Chiodo, 9 I-37121 Verona / IT | [1995/33] | Representative(s) | Rottmann, Maximilian, et al Rottmann, Zimmermann + Partner AG Gartenstrasse 28 A 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | Rottmann, Maximilian R., et al c/o Rottmann, Zimmermann + Partner AG Glattalstrasse 37 8052 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [1995/33] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 95101498.4 | 03.02.1995 | [1995/33] | Priority number, date | IT1994VR00007 | 07.02.1994 Original published format: IT VR940007 | [1995/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0667475 | Date: | 16.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0667475 | Date: | 28.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F16L3/14, F16L3/133 | [1995/33] | CPC: |
F16L3/133 (EP);
F16L3/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1995/33] | Title | German: | Rohraufhängevorrichtung | [1995/33] | English: | Supporting collar for pipes | [1995/33] | French: | Dispositif de suspension pour tuyaux | [1995/33] | Examination procedure | 05.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/14] | 29.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.08.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1998 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   21.07.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US1582358 (TOMKINSON CHARLES C) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [A] 6,8; | [XA]US2466247 (LAND JOHN A) [X] 1 * figures 1,2 * [A] 6,8; | [XA]FR2439928 (HILTI AG [LI]) [X] 1 * figures 1,2 * [A] 2,5,8,10; | [A]EP0165370 (VRIJHOF JAN) [A] 1,2* figures 1-12 *; | [XA]DE9217960U (MEFA-DUEBELFABRIK F. KRAETZER GMBH & CO.) [X] 1 * figures 1-4 * [A] 6-8 |