EP0676177 - Transverse connector for spinal column devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.10.2002 [2002/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DePuy AcroMed, Inc. 325 Paramount Drive Raynham, MA 02767-0350 / US | [2001/42] |
Former [2001/22] | For all designated states DePuy Acromed, Inc. 325 Paramount Drive Raynham, MA 02767-0350 / US | ||
Former [1995/41] | For all designated states ACROMED CORPORATION 3303 Carnegie Avenue Cleveland Ohio 44115 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DiNello, Alexandre M. 17707 Lomond Blvd. Shaker Hts, Ohio 44122 / US | 02 /
Ibrahim, Kamal N. 117 Indian Trail Road Oakbrook, Illinois 60521 / US | 03 /
Dorsky, Steven G. 70 Skylark Road Springfield, New Jersey 07081 / US | [1995/41] | Representative(s) | Rottmann, Maximilian Rottmann, Zimmermann + Partner AG Gartenstrasse 28 A 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1995/41] | Rottmann, Maximilian R. c/o Rottmann, Zimmermann + Partner AG Glattalstrasse 37 CH-8052 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 95101734.2 | 09.02.1995 | [1995/41] | Priority number, date | US19940208345 | 09.03.1994 Original published format: US 208345 | [1995/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0676177 | Date: | 11.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0676177 | Date: | 14.08.1996 | [1996/33] | Type: | A1 / A2 RE Reissue of A-publication | No.: | EP0676177 | Date: | 27.11.1996 | [1996/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0676177 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/58 | [1995/41] | CPC: |
A61B17/7052 (EP,US);
A61B17/58 (KR);
Y10T403/7194 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1995/41] | Title | German: | Querverbindung für Wirbelsäulenvorrichtung | [1995/41] | English: | Transverse connector for spinal column devices | [1995/41] | French: | Connecteur transversal pour dispositifs rochidiens | [1995/41] | Examination procedure | 06.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/41] | 15.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]EP0446092 (SOFAMOR [FR]) [X] 1-3,6-8 * column 2, line 20 - column 3, line 32; figures 1-6 * [A] 17,20,24 [Y] 4,5,9,10,14-16; | [YA]US5092893 (SMITH THOMAS E [US]) [Y] 4,5,9,10,14-16 * column 2, line 58 - column 5, line 27; figures 1-8 *[A] 17,19-21,23 |