EP0668271 - Process for the preparation of isocyanurate-group containing polyisocyanates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.2002 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2002/03] |
Former [1995/34] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brandt, Dr. Peter Bismarckstr. 120a D-67059 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
Bruchmann, Dr. Bernd Giselherstr. 79 D-67069 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
Laqua, Dr. Gerhard Neckarpromenade 20 D-68167 Mannheim / DE | 04 /
Merger, Dr. Franz Max-Slevogt-Str. 25 D-67227 Frankenthal / DE | 05 /
Otterbach, Dr. Andreas Knietschstr. 13 D-67227 Frankenthal / DE | 06 /
Stiefenhöfer, Konrad Eisenberger Str. 5 D-67280 Ebertsheim / DE | 07 /
Witzel, Dr. Tom Kriemhildstr. 34 D-67069 Ludwigshafen / DE | 08 /
Wolff, Dr. Stefan Carl-Bosch-Str. 43 D-67117 Limburgerhof / DE | 09 /
Becker, Dr. Rainer Im Haseneck 22 D-67098 Bad Dürkheim / DE | [2002/01] |
Former [1995/34] | 01 /
Brandt, Dr. Peter Bismarckstr. 120a D-67059 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
02 /
Bruchmann, Dr. Bernd Giselherstr. 79 D-67069 Ludwigshaven / DE | |||
03 /
Laqua, Dr. Gerhard Neckarpromenade 20 D-68167 Mannheim / DE | |||
04 /
Merger, Dr. Franz Max-Slevogt-Str. 25 D-67227 Frankenthal / DE | |||
05 /
Otterbach, Dr. Andreas Knietschstr. 13 D-67227 Frankenthal / DE | |||
06 /
Stiefenhöfer, Konrad Eisenberger Str. 5 D-67280 Ebertsheim / DE | |||
07 /
Witzel, Dr. Tom Kreimhildstr. 34 D-67069 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
08 /
Wolff, Dr. Stefan Carl-Bosch-Str. 43 D-67117 Limburgerhof / DE | |||
09 /
Becker, Dr. Rainer Im Haseneck 22 D-67098 Bad Dürkheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 95101740.9 | 09.02.1995 | [1995/34] | Priority number, date | DE19944405055 | 17.02.1994 Original published format: DE 4405055 | [1995/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0668271 | Date: | 23.08.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0668271 | Date: | 16.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C07D251/34, C08G18/79 | [1995/34] | CPC: |
C07D251/34 (EP,US);
C08G18/792 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1995/34] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Isocyanuratgruppen aufweisenden Polyisocyanaten | [1995/34] | English: | Process for the preparation of isocyanurate-group containing polyisocyanates | [1995/34] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de polyisocyanates contenant des groupes isocyanurates | [1995/34] | Examination procedure | 11.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/11] | 24.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 16.04.2002 | SE | 16.04.2002 | [2003/45] |
Former [2002/37] | SE | 16.04.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US3703520 (CARLETON PETER S, et al) [DA] 1 * claim - *; | [DA]DE2631733 (AIR PROD & CHEM) [DA] 1 * claim - *; | [A]US4454317 (DISTELDORF JOSEF [DE], et al) [A] 1 * claim - *; | [A]EP0512213 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1* Seite 5, Zeile 45- Seite 6 * |